EP1668177 - METHOD FOR HYDRODYNAMICALLY SOLIDIFYING AN ESSENTIALLY HOMOGENOUS LAYER MADE OF FIBRES OF ANY PARTICULAR TYPE AND SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.11.2011 [2011/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fleissner GmbH Wolfgartenstrasse 6 63329 Egelsbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Fleissner GmbH Wolfsgartenstr.6 63329 Egelsbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MÜNSTERMANN, Ullrich Leipziger Str. 33 63329 Egelsbach / DE | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2007/43] |
Former [2006/24] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann, et al Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partner Patentanwaltskanzlei Barckhausstrasse 12-16 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 04766703.5 | 03.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004EP52040 | Priority number, date | DE2003144672 | 25.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10344672 | [2006/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031056 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668177 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668177 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/46, D04H3/10, D04H13/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
D04H18/04 (EP,US);
D04H1/495 (EP,US);
D04H3/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HYDRODYNAMISCHEN VERFESTIGEN EINER IM WESENTLICHEN HOMOGENEN SCHICHT AUS FASERN BELIEBIGER ART UND ANLAGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2006/35] | English: | METHOD FOR HYDRODYNAMICALLY SOLIDIFYING AN ESSENTIALLY HOMOGENOUS LAYER MADE OF FIBRES OF ANY PARTICULAR TYPE AND SYSTEM FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2006/24] | French: | PROCEDE POUR CONSOLIDER DE MANIERE HYDRODYNAMIQUE UNE COUCHE, SENSIBLEMENT HOMOGENE, CONSTITUEE DE FIBRES DE TOUT TYPE ET INSTALLATION POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/24] | VERFAHREN ZUM HYDRODYNAMISCHEN VERFESTIGEN EINER IM WESENTLICHEN HOMOGENEN SCHICHT AUS FASERN BELIEBIGER ART UND ANLAGE ZUR DURCHF HRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | Entry into regional phase | 25.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 12.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 27.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2007
26.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 BOIS-COLOMBES / FR Opponent's representative Cortier, Sophie, et al, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2007
26.09.2007
ADMISSIBLE GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE 60, avenue de l'Europe 92270 BOIS-COLOMBES / FR Opponent's representative Cortier, Sophie, et al, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.09.2007
GEORGIA-PACIFIC FRANCE 11, route industrielle KUNHEIM 68320 Kuhnheim / FR Opponent's representative Cortier, Sophie, et al, et al Georgia-Pacific France Service Propriété Industrielle 23, Boulevard Georges Clemenceau 92415 Courbevoie Cedex / FR | 23.10.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.02.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 11.05.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.06.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.06.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.07.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.12.2006 | CZ | 13.12.2006 | DK | 13.12.2006 | EE | 13.12.2006 | FI | 13.12.2006 | GB | 13.12.2006 | IE | 13.12.2006 | NL | 13.12.2006 | PT | 13.12.2006 | RO | 13.12.2006 | SI | 13.12.2006 | SK | 13.12.2006 | BG | 13.03.2007 | SE | 13.03.2007 | GR | 14.03.2007 | HU | 14.06.2007 | AT | 03.09.2007 | LU | 03.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | CH | 30.09.2008 | LI | 30.09.2008 | [2011/46] |
Former [2009/48] | CY | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
HU | 14.06.2007 | ||
AT | 03.09.2007 | ||
LU | 03.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2008 | ||
LI | 30.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 13.12.2006 | |
CZ | 13.12.2006 | ||
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
HU | 14.06.2007 | ||
AT | 03.09.2007 | ||
LU | 03.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/31] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 03.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
CH | 30.09.2007 | ||
LI | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
EE | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 03.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
AT | 03.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
GR | 14.03.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
GB | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
DK | 13.12.2006 | ||
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
SK | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | CZ | 13.12.2006 | |
FI | 13.12.2006 | ||
IE | 13.12.2006 | ||
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
RO | 13.12.2006 | ||
SI | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | FI | 13.12.2006 | |
NL | 13.12.2006 | ||
BG | 13.03.2007 | ||
SE | 13.03.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2536432 (FONTANAROUX ETS [FR]) [A] 1,5,7-13 * page 3, line 32 - page 4, line 8; figures 1-8 *; | [A]US4514455 (HWANG SANG-HAK [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]FR2601970 (VUILLAUME ANDRE [FR]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US5414915 (PRYNE WILSON H [US]) [X] 13 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 49; figures 3a-c,4a-b *; | [X]WO02052083 (FLEISSNER MASCHF GMBH CO [DE], et al) [X] 13 * page 2, lines 5-24 * * page 5, line 5 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, lines 9-21; figures 1,2,5,6 *; | [X]US6568049 (PUTNAM MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-13 * column 1, lines 8-10 * * column 1, line 7 - column 6, line 17; figures 1-4; claims 1,2,13-17 * |