EP1660285 - WOOD PROTECTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BERNINGHAUSEN, Carl Hartwigstrasse 31 28209 Bremen / DE | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERNINGHAUSEN, Carl Hartwigstrasse 31 28209 Bremen / DE | 02 /
RAPP, Andreas Gergenbusch 17 21465 Reinbek / DE | 03 /
WELZBACHER, Christian Schönningstedter Str. 78 A 21465 Reinbek / DE | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Jochen, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstraße 5 21680 Stade / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Hansen, Jochen, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hansen Eisenbahnstrasse 5 21680 Stade / DE | Application number, filing date | 04766743.1 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004EP52091 | Priority number, date | DE20031041883 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10341883 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005025824 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660285 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B27K5/02, B27K3/00 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B27K3/0242 (EP);
B27K3/0278 (EP);
B27K3/36 (EP);
B27K5/001 (EP);
B27K5/02 (EP);
B27K2240/70 (EP);
B27K2240/90 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOLZSCHUTZVERFAHREN | [2006/22] | English: | WOOD PROTECTION METHOD | [2006/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE PROTECTION DU BOIS | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 17.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1642171 (DESOWAG-BAYER HOLZSCHUTZ GMBH; DESOWAG-BAYER HOLZSCHUTZ GMBH, 4000 DUE) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 4 - page 7; claims 1,2 *; | [X]DE561221 (PAUL ENTROP) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,9 * the whole document *; | [X]US4971840 (BOHO ET AL) [X] 1-3,5-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - line 67 * * column 2, lines 14-19 * * claim - *; | [X]US2002128367 (DAISEY GEORGE IRWIN ET AL) [X] 1-4,8,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] , [0009] , [0026] , [0033] , [0035] , [0036] , [0050] *; | [X]EP0328323 (ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY) [X] 1-4,8,10 * page 5, lines 30-40 * * example IX; claims 1,3,7,10 * |