EP1768821 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AVOIDING COLLISIONS BETWEEN MOVEABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société de Materiel Industriel et D'Equipement-SMIE 7 Rue de la Chapelle Z.I. Les Richardets 93160 Noisy Le Grand / FR | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEAULIER, François 5, chemin du parc de Charonne F-75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
BRACH, Vincent 90, route de Stratégique F-94270 Le Kremlin Bicetre / FR | 03 /
BILLEBAUT, Jean-Claude 65, rue Camélinat F-94400 Vitry-sur-Seine / FR | [2007/25] |
Former [2007/14] | 01 /
BEAULIEU, François 5, chemin du parc de Charonne F-75020 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
BRACH, Vincent 90, route de Stratégique F-94270 Le Kremlin Bicetre / FR | |||
03 /
BILLEBAUT, Jean-Claude 65, rue Camélinat F-94400 Vitry-sur-Seine / FR | Representative(s) | Brema-Loyer 63 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Loyer 161, rue de Courcelles F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 04767728.1 | 19.07.2004 | [2007/14] | WO2004FR01905 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006018485 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768821 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
B25J9/1666 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39082 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40468 (EP,US);
G05B2219/40492 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM VERMEIDEN VON KOLLISIONEN ZWISCHEN BEWEGLICHEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2007/14] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AVOIDING COLLISIONS BETWEEN MOVEABLE DEVICES | [2007/14] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'EVITEMENT DE COLLISION POUR ENGINS MOBILES | [2007/14] | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/14] | 27.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/05] | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4578757 (STARK JOHAN S H [SE]) [X] 1-36 * column 4, line 7 - column 6, line 55; figures 2,3 *; | [X]US6393362 (BURNS RAY L [US]) [X] 1-36 * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 12 * * column 7, line 15 - line 48 * * column 9, line 4 - line 38; figures 2a,2b,9 *; | [A]US5347459 (GREENSPAN MICHAEL A [CA], et al) [A] 1,36 * the whole document * | [X] - KWON S J ET AL, "Self-collision avoidance for n-link redundant manipulators", DECISION AIDING FOR COMPLEX SYSTEMS. CHARLOTTESVILLE, VA., OCT. 13 - 16, 1991, PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN AND CYBERNETICS, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19911013), VOL. 1 _, ISBN 0-7803-0233-8, pages 937 - 942, XP010054847 [X] 1,36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1991.169808 | [X] - XAVIER P G, "Fast swept-volume distance for robust collision detection", ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION, 1997. PROCEEDINGS., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ALBUQUERQUE, NM, USA 20-25 APRIL 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19970420), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-3612-7, pages 1162 - 1169, XP010235618 [X] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1997.614295 |