EP1648755 - Method for managing the control of a maximum steering angle of a vehicle steering system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/17] | METHOD FOR MANAGING THE CONTROL OF A MAXIMUM STEERING ANGLE OF A VEHICLE STEERING SYSTEM | ||
[2006/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RENAULT TRUCKS 99 route de Lyon 69800 St Priest / FR | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DECHAMP, François Lotissement des Grandes Terres F-71250 Cluny / FR | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Vuillermoz, Bruno Cabinet Laurent & Charras B.P. 32 20, rue Louis Chirpaz 69134 Ecully Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04767862.8 | 30.06.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004FR50300 | Priority number, date | FR20030050373 | 25.07.2003 Original published format: FR 0350373 | [2006/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005012064 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648755 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648755 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B62D5/04 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B62D6/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur handhabung der Steuerung eines maximalen Lenkwinkels eines Fahrzeuglenksystem | [2006/51] | English: | Method for managing the control of a maximum steering angle of a vehicle steering system | [2006/51] | French: | Procédé de gestion de la commande de l'angle de braquage d'un système de direction d'un vehicule | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/17] | VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG DER STEUERUNG EINES MAXIMALEN LENKWINKELS EINES FAHRZEUGLENKSYSTEMS | ||
Former [2006/17] | METHOD FOR MANAGING THE CONTROL OF A MAXIMUM STEERING ANGLE OF A VEHICLE STEERING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2006/17] | PROCEDE DE GESTION DE LA COMMANDE DE L'ANGLE DE BRAQUAGE D'UN SYSTEME DE DIRECTION D'UN VEHICULE | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 19.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.04.2007 | CY | 18.04.2007 | CZ | 18.04.2007 | DK | 18.04.2007 | EE | 18.04.2007 | FI | 18.04.2007 | GB | 18.04.2007 | IE | 18.04.2007 | NL | 18.04.2007 | PL | 18.04.2007 | RO | 18.04.2007 | SI | 18.04.2007 | SK | 18.04.2007 | TR | 18.04.2007 | BE | 30.06.2007 | LU | 30.06.2007 | MC | 30.06.2007 | BG | 18.07.2007 | GR | 19.07.2007 | ES | 29.07.2007 | PT | 18.09.2007 | HU | 19.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
GB | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
LU | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
HU | 19.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CY | 18.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
GB | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
EE | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
GB | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
GB | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
RO | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
GB | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.06.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
GR | 19.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
SK | 18.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
CZ | 18.04.2007 | ||
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
IE | 18.04.2007 | ||
NL | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.06.2007 | ||
BG | 18.07.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
DK | 18.04.2007 | ||
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 18.04.2007 | |
FI | 18.04.2007 | ||
PL | 18.04.2007 | ||
SI | 18.04.2007 | ||
ES | 29.07.2007 | ||
PT | 18.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 18.04.2007 | |
ES | 29.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5944137 (MOSER MARTIN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 23; figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]US6041882 (BOHNER HUBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 3, line 7 - column 4, line 5; figures 1,2; claim 1 *; | [A]EP1088739 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP]) [A] 1-5* figure 2; claims 1,4 * |