EP1668340 - ISOKINETIC SAMPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:FR
Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/03] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2006/29] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LI
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
Former [2006/24] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
SCHLUMBERGER HOLDINGS LIMITED P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint-Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIE, Cheng-Gang 9 Hide Close, Sawston Cambridgeshire CB2 4UR / GB | 02 /
ATKINSON, Ian 9 Williams Close, Ely CambridgeshireCB7 4FQ / GB | 03 /
HAMMOND, Paul 62 High Street, Bourn CambridgeshireCB3 7TR / GB | 04 /
ODDIE, Gary M. 196 Manor Gardens, Cambridge Street, St. Neots Cambridgeshire PE19 1PU / GB | 05 /
BOLCHOVER, Paul 19 Carisbrooke Road Cambridge CB4 3LP / GB | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Mirza, Akram Karim, et al Intellectual Property Law Department Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 0EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Mirza, Akram Karim, et al Intellectual Property Law Department, Schlumberger Cambridge Research Limited, High Cross, Madingley Road Cambridge CB3 OEL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04768396.6 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004GB03849 | Priority number, date | GB20030022702 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0322702 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031311 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668340 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/20, G01N33/28, G01F1/74 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G01F1/34 (EP,US);
B01F25/45 (EP,US);
B01F25/10 (GB);
B01F25/40 (GB);
B01F25/4521 (EP,US);
G01F1/42 (EP,US);
G01F1/44 (EP,US);
G01F1/74 (EP,GB,US);
G01F25/13 (EP,US);
G01F5/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/10 (GB);
G01N1/2035 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOKINETISCHE PROBENNAHME | [2006/24] | English: | ISOKINETIC SAMPLING | [2006/24] | French: | ECHANTILLONNAGE ISOCINETIQUE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 21.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 14.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO0049370 (ANDREUSSI PAOLO [IT]) [DX] 1-79 * abstract * * page 3, line 9 - page 6, line 33 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 23 * * page 9, line 10 - page 10, line 17 * * page 11, line 12 - page 14, line 17 *; | [XY]US4881412 (NORTHEDGE RONALD [GB]) [X] 1-17,29-45,56 * abstract * * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 62 * * column 4, line 6 - line 62 * * column 5, line 21 - column 6, line 60 * [Y] 18-28,46-55; | [XA]US6128962 (MARRELLI JOHN D [US], et al) [X] 1-17,29-45,56 * abstract * * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 20 * * column 4, line 10 - column 6, line 67 * [A] 18-28,46-55; | [X]US5861561 (VAN CLEVE CRAIG BRAINERD [US], et al) [X] 1-17,29-45,56 * abstract * * column 2, line 31 - line 63 * * column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 43 *; | [X]US5535632 (KOLPAK MIROSLAV M [US]) [X] 1-17,29-45,56 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - column 5, line 56 * * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 10 *; | [XY]EP0690292 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [X] 57-79 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 58 * [Y] 18-28,46-55; | [XA]US4574643 (SCOTT DONALD S [CA], et al) [X] 57-79 * abstract * * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 19 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 44 * [A] 18-28,46-55; | [XA]US4429581 (FURMAGA ROBERT E [US]) [X] 57-79 * abstract * * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 12 * * column 2, line 21 - column 4, line 40 * [A] 18-28,46-55; | [A]WO9833051 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) [A] 1-79 * abstract * * page 3, line 1 - line 4 * * page 5, line 10 - page 6, line 5 *; | [A]US5654502 (DUTTON ROBERT E [US]) [A] 1-79 * abstract *; | [A]US5894080 (DYBDAHL BJOERN [NO]) [A] 18-28,46-55,57-79 * abstract * * column 1, line 51 - line 57 * * column 4, line 21 - line 47 *; | [A]EP0561557 (HORIBA INSTR INC [US]) [A] 1-79 * abstract * * column 2, line 37 - column 3, line 23 *; | [A]US4776210 (BAILLIE LLOYD A [US], et al) [A] 1-79 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 30 *; | [A]US4167117 (STOKLEY CHARLES O, et al) [A] 1-79 * abstract *; | [A]WO9522400 (DYBDAHL BJOERN [NO]) [A] 18-28,46-55,57-79 * abstract * |