EP1663879 - TREATMENT OF IRON SULPHIDE DEPOSITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodia UK Limited Oak House, Reeds Crescent Watford, Hertfordshire WD24 4QP / GB | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TALBOT, Robert, Eric 3 Meriden close Cannock, Staffordshire WS11 1QB / GB | 02 /
JONES, Christopher, Raymond 110 Sutherland Road Cheslyn Hay, Staffordshire WS6 7BS / GB | 03 /
GRECH, Jason, Mark 24 Bamburgh Crescent, The Berkeleys Worcester WR4 1QX / GB | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Cordier, Pascal Christian, et al Rhodia Operations Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Cordier, Pascal Christian, et al Rhodia Operations Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie Coq 93306 Aubervilliers / FR | ||
Former [2013/15] | Cardon, Flavie, et al RHODIA OPERATIONS Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/02] | Seugnet, Jean Louis, et al RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/23] | Valentino, Cédric Rhodia Propriété Industrielle 85, Avenue des Fréres Perret F-69192 Saint-Fons / FR | Application number, filing date | 04768403.0 | 10.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004GB03856 | Priority number, date | GB20030021276 | 11.09.2003 Original published format: GB 0321276 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005026065 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663879 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/14 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C23F14/02 (EP,US);
C02F5/145 (EP,US);
C23F11/1676 (EP,US);
C02F2101/101 (EP,US);
C02F2101/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNG VON EISENSULFIDABLAGERUNGEN | [2006/23] | English: | TREATMENT OF IRON SULPHIDE DEPOSITS | [2006/23] | French: | TRAITEMENT DES DEPOTS DE SULFURE DE FER | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 16.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 04.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 19.06.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 13.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 13.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0021892 (ALBRIGHT & WILSON UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 1, line 26 - page 3, line 19 * * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 15; claims 1-19,22,24,25 *; | [Y]WO0208127 (RHODIA CONS SPEC LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 29 * * page 5, lines 5-14 * * page 14, lines 14-17; claims 1-11,28-39,45,46 *; | [Y]WO03016432 (SYNERGY CHEMICAL INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-25 * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 17, paragraph 1 - page 22, paragraph 2; claims 1,6,7,10,11,21-25,44-49 *; | [Y]WO03021031 (RHODIA CONS SPEC LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-25 * the whole document * |