EP1696765 - A SELF-STABILIZING SUPPORT ASSEMBLY FOR AN ITEM OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shiranor Investments Limited c/o Nerine Trust Company Limited Nerine Chambers Main Street Road Town, Tortola / VG | [2006/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brooke, Rory 30 Sandsteen Road Pendale Randvaal 1961 Meyerton, Gauteng Province / ZA | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Smyth, Gyles Darren Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Smyth, Gyles Darren Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04769579.6 | 07.10.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004IB03270 | Priority number, date | ZA20030007931 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: ZA 200307931 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005034680 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1696765 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1696765 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47B91/16 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
A47B91/16 (EP,KR,US);
A47B13/00 (KR);
A47B13/02 (KR);
A47B13/023 (EP,US);
A47B91/00 (KR);
A47B2013/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTSTABILISIERENDE STÜTZANORDNUNG FÜR EIN MÖBELSTÜCK | [2006/36] | English: | A SELF-STABILIZING SUPPORT ASSEMBLY FOR AN ITEM OF FURNITURE | [2006/36] | French: | ENSEMBLE SUPPORT AUTOSTABLE POUR ELEMENT DE MOBILIER | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 13.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.08.2007 | BE | 01.08.2007 | CH | 01.08.2007 | CY | 01.08.2007 | CZ | 01.08.2007 | EE | 01.08.2007 | FI | 01.08.2007 | LI | 01.08.2007 | RO | 01.08.2007 | SI | 01.08.2007 | SK | 01.08.2007 | TR | 01.08.2007 | LU | 07.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | BG | 01.11.2007 | SE | 01.11.2007 | HU | 02.02.2008 | [2015/21] |
Former [2009/44] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
TR | 01.08.2007 | ||
LU | 07.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
LU | 07.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
HU | 02.02.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CY | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
EE | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
RO | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
SE | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
SK | 01.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
BE | 01.08.2007 | ||
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 01.08.2007 | |
CH | 01.08.2007 | ||
FI | 01.08.2007 | ||
LI | 01.08.2007 | ||
BG | 01.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 01.08.2007 | |
BG | 01.11.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3185423 (JONES III LEE B); | [A]GB1315833 (DAINTY K J); | [A]US3768766 (BAIN A); | [A]US5490648 (CULLEN CHRISTOPHER P [US]); | [A]US5690303 (WINTERS HENRY [US]); | [A]US5899422 (EKE ALAN [US]); | [A]WO0059344 (GWYNNETH MARK [AU]) |