EP1668416 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING A RETICLE USED IN CHIP PRODUCTION FROM CONTAMINATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2009 | Refusal of application | published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOOS, Marinus, A., D., M. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VONCKEN, Rudolf, M., J. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Reints Bok, Wouter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Reints Bok, Wouter Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04770013.3 | 16.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004IB51774 | Priority number, date | EP20030103509 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: EP 03103509 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005029183 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668416 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G03F1/14, G03F7/20 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G03F1/64 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70983 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHUTZ EINES BEI DER CHIPPRODUKTION VERWENDETEN RETIKELS VOR VERUNREINIGUNG | [2006/24] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROTECTING A RETICLE USED IN CHIP PRODUCTION FROM CONTAMINATION | [2006/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA CONTAMINATION D'UNE RETICULE UTILISEE DANS LA FABRICATION DES PUCES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.02.2009 | 08.12.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/19] | 25.12.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/19] | 03.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS6097356 ; | [DA]US2001004508 (SHIRASAKI TORU [JP]) [DA] 1-10 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] *; | [A]JPH04196117 ; | [A]US6593034 (SHIRASAKI TORU [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US2003035222 (OKADA KANAME [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851003), vol. 009, no. 246, Database accession no. (P - 393), & JP60097356 A 19850531 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19921027), vol. 016, no. 521, Database accession no. (E - 1285), & JP04196117 A 19920715 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | by applicant | JPS6097356 |