EP1668683 - METHOD OF FORMING DIELECTRIC LAYERS WITH LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SACHDEV, Harbans 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-SJ41 San Jose, CA 95131-1706 / US | 02 /
LEUNG, Garkay 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-SJ41 San Jose, CA 95131-1706 / US | 03 /
RAPP, John 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 04 /
MATERA-LONGO, Mary 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 05 /
SARMA, Nara 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 06 /
MEISNER, Stephen 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/44] | Schouten, Marcus Maria, et al NXP B.V. IP & L Department High Tech Campus 32 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2008/14] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2006/24] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 04770031.5 | 18.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004IB51793 | Priority number, date | US20030504452P | 19.09.2003 Original published format: US 504452 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005029567 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668683 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/312, H01L21/316 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
H01L21/02126 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02282 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02203 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02216 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02307 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG DIELEKTRISCHER SCHICHTEN MIT NIEDRIGEN DIELEKTRIZITÄTSKONSTANTEN | [2006/24] | English: | METHOD OF FORMING DIELECTRIC LAYERS WITH LOW DIELECTRIC CONSTANTS | [2006/24] | French: | PROCEDE DE FORMATION DE COUCHES DIELECTRIQUES A FAIBLES CONSTANTES DIELECTRIQUES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 15.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 01.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003257836 ; | [A]US5429673 (PETERSON WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US6066578 (GUPTA SUBHASH [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1119035 (APPLIED MATERIALS INC [US]) [A] 11-15* paragraph [0062]; figure 7 *; | [X]US2002017641 (LU JIONG-PING [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6 * paragraphs [0037] - [0046] *; | [A]US6361820 (HACKER NIGEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [X]US2002160319 (ENDO HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraphs [0010] , [0019] * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003257836 A 20030912 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5 * abstract * |