EP1669785 - CAMERA, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS, INTERMEDIATE ADAPTER, AND CAMERA SYSTEM INCLUDING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/24] | CAMERA, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS, INTERMEDIATE ADAPTOR, AND CAMERA SYSTEM INCLUDING THEM | ||
[2011/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYASAKA, Tetsuo c/o intellectual Property Dept OLYMPUS CORPORATION 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | [2011/39] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
MIYASAKA, Tetsuo c/o intellectual Property Dept, OLYMPUS INTELLECTU 2-3 Kuboyama-cho, Hachioji-shi, Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/39] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04771148.6 | 03.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004JP11094 | Priority number, date | JP20030292267 | 12.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003292267 | [2006/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005015282 | Date: | 17.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1669785 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1669785 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/28, G03B3/00, G03B17/12, G03B17/14 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G02B15/10 (EP,US);
G02B7/34 (EP,US);
G03B17/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2006/46] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KAMERA, WECHSELBARE LINSE, ZWISCHENADAPTER UND KAMERASYSTEM DAMIT | [2011/30] | English: | CAMERA, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS, INTERMEDIATE ADAPTER, AND CAMERA SYSTEM INCLUDING THEM | [2011/30] | French: | APPAREIL PHOTO, LENTILLE INTERCHANGEABLE, ADAPTATEUR INTERMEDIAIRE ET SYSTEME D'APPAREILS PHOTO COMPRENANT CES ELEMENTS. | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/24] | KAMERA, WECHSELBARE LINSE, ZWISCHENADAPTERUND KAMERASYSTEM DAMIT | ||
Former [2006/24] | CAMERA, INTERCHANGEABLE LENS, INTERMEDIATE ADAPTOR, AND CAMERA SYSTEM INCLUDING THEM | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2005 | Translation filed | 24.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2005 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2006 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4881094 (TERUI NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [Y] 24 * column 4, line 1 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [X]US4912494 (TANAKA TSUNEFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1-34 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0443463 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1,16,25,32* the whole document *; | [XY]US5172154 (KATAGISHI YUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,16,25,32 * columns 5,6; figures 1,2 * [Y] 24 | International search | [Y]JPS63141030 (SIGMA KK); | [Y]JPS63199330 (NIKON CORP); | [A]JPS63200132 (MINOLTA CAMERA KK); | [A]JPH0283510 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [Y]JPH03240029 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH0493824 (NIKON CORP); | [A]JPH09120026 (NIKON CORP) |