EP1657305 - INTERACTION INHIBITORS, METHOD OF DETECTING INTERACTION INHIBITOR AND KIT FOR DETECTING INTERACTION INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celestar Lexico-Sciences, Inc. Makuhari Techno Garden D17, 1-3, Nakase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi Chiba 261-8501 / JP | [2006/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIHARA, Satoshi, c/o Celestar Lexico-Sciences, Inc Makuhari Techno Garden D17, 1-3 Nakase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 2618501 / JP | 02 /
DOI, Hirofumi, c/o Celestar Lexico-Sciences, Inc. Makuhari Techno Garden D17, 1-3 Nakase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 2618501 / JP | [2006/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/20] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04771653.5 | 13.08.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004JP11686 | Priority number, date | JP20030295204 | 19.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003295204 | [2006/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017146 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657305 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/48, G01N33/68 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
G01N33/6875 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C12Q1/485 (EP,US);
G01N2500/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/20] | C12N15/00, C12N9/99, C12Q1/48, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WECHSELWIRKUNGSINHIBITOREN, VERFAHREN ZUM NACHWEIS EINES WECHSELWIRKUNGSINHIBITORS SOWIE KIT ZUM NACHWEIS EINES WECHSELWIRKUNGSINHIBITORS | [2006/20] | English: | INTERACTION INHIBITORS, METHOD OF DETECTING INTERACTION INHIBITOR AND KIT FOR DETECTING INTERACTION INHIBITOR | [2006/20] | French: | INHIBITEURS D'INTERACTION, PROCEDE ET KIT DE DETECTION D'UN INHIBITEUR D'INTERACTION | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | Translation filed | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 26.05.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - ALTMAN AMNON ET AL, "Protein kinase C-theta (PKCtheta): It's all about location, location, location.", IMMUNOLOGICAL REVIEWS, (200304), vol. 192, ISSN 0105-2896, pages 53 - 63, XP002418659 [A] 6,8-15 * abstract * * page 54, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 3 * * page 56, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 58, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 59, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1034/j.1600-065X.2003.00027.x | [A] - ISAKOV NOAH ET AL, "Protein kinase C(theta) in T cell activation.", ANNUAL REVIEW OF IMMUNOLOGY 2002, (2002), vol. 20, ISSN 0732-0582, pages 761 - 794, XP002418660 [A] 6,8-15 * abstract * * page 766, paragraph 4 - page 770, paragraph 1 * * page 775, paragraph 3 - page 780, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.20.100301.064807 | [PA] - MATTIOLI IVAN ET AL, "Transient and selective NF-kappaB p65 serine 536 phosphorylation induced by T cell costimulation is mediated by licB kinase beta and controls the kinetics of p65 nuclear import", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20040515), vol. 172, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6336 - 6344, XP002418661 [PA] 6,8-15 * abstract * * page 6336, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 6340, column 2, paragraph 1 * | International search | [A]WO0131051 (ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO03004612 (UNIV YALE [US], et al); | [A]WO03054228 (AXXIMA PHARMACEUTICALS AG [DE], et al); | [X] - CUNNINGHAM M.D. ET AL., "An intracellular targeted NLS peptide inhibitor of karyopherin alpha: NF-kappa B interactions", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (20030110), vol. 300, no. 2, pages 403 - 407, XP002904126 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(02)02863-2 | [A] - ARENDT C.W. ET AL., "Protein kinase c-theta;: signaling from the center of the T-cell synapse", CURR OPIN IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 14, no. 3, pages 323 - 330, XP004350482 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(02)00346-1 | [A] - COUDRONNIERE N. ET AL., "NF-kappa B activation induced by T cell receptor / CD 28 costimulation is mediated by protein kinase C-theta", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2000), vol. 97, no. 7, pages 3394 - 3399, XP002940087 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.060028097 | [T] - ABBOUSHI N. ET AL., "Ceramide inhibits IL-2 production by preventing protein kinase C-dependent NF-(kappa)B Activation protein kinase C (theta) Regulation", J. IMMUNOL, (20040901), vol. 173, no. 5, pages 3193 - 3200, XP002904127 |