EP1780390 - ENGINE CONTROLLER AND CONTROLLING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Shinya@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | 02 /
NAKAGAWA, Shinji@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | 03 /
KAKUYA, Hiromu@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | 04 /
MINOWA, Toshimichi@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | 05 /
NEMOTO, Mamoru@c/o Automotive Systems, Hitachi, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 3128503 / JP | [2012/12] |
Former [2012/11] | 01 /
SATO, Shinya@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGAWA, Shinji@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
03 /
KAKUYA, Hiromu@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319129 2 / JP | |||
04 /
MINOWA, Toshimichi@c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory, Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
05 /
NEMOTO, Mamoru@c/o Automotive Systems, Hitachi, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 3128503 / JP | |||
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
SATO, Shinya c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGAWA, Shinji c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
03 /
KAKUYA, Hiromu c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319129 2 / JP | |||
04 /
MINOWA, Toshimichi c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
05 /
NEMOTO, Mamoru c/o Automotive Systems Hitachi, Ltd. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 3128503 / JP | |||
Former [2011/47] | 01 /
SATO, Shinya, c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGAWA, Shinji, c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
03 /
KAKUYA, Hiromu, c/o Hitachi Research Laboratory 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319129 2 / JP | |||
04 /
MINOWA, Toshimichi, c/o Automotive Systems 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
05 /
NEMOTO, Mamoru, c/o Automotive Systems 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 3128503 / JP | |||
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
SATO, Shinya, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAGAWA, Shinji, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
03 /
KAKUYA, Hiromu, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 319129 2 / JP | |||
04 /
MINOWA, Toshimichi, c/o Hitachi, Ltd. 1-1, Omikacho 7-chome Hitachi-shi, Ibaraki 3191292 / JP | |||
05 /
NEMOTO, Mamoru, c/o HITACHI, LTD. 2520, Takaba Hitachinaka-shi, Ibaraki 3128503 / JP | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/47] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/18] | Beetz & Partner Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04771903.4 | 13.08.2004 | [2007/18] | WO2004JP11942 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016423 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1780390 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1780390 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1780390 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/04, F02D17/02, F02D41/12, F02D9/02 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
F02D41/0002 (EP,US);
F02D11/105 (EP,US);
F02D17/02 (EP,US);
F02D9/02 (EP,US);
F02D2200/0404 (EP,US);
F02D2250/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/47] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MOTORSTEUERUNG UND STEUERVERFAHREN | [2007/18] | English: | ENGINE CONTROLLER AND CONTROLLING METHOD | [2007/18] | French: | COMMANDE DE MOTEUR ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE | [2007/18] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | Translation filed | 13.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/18] | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02221658 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [A] 1,5,8,9 * abstract *; | [A]US5427072 (UDO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH08193534 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1,5,8,9* abstract *; | [A]EP1146216 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1,5,8,9 * claims 1,3 * | International search | [A]JPH08193534 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JP2001047892 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2000073831 (UNISIA JECS CORP, et al) |