EP1657272 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 06.03.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2017/35] |
Former [2012/27] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | ||
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 14-1, Shiba 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | ||
Former [2006/20] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 33-8, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0014 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HYOUDOU, Narutoshi, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Tatsuo, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 17-1, Towada, Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 03 /
HAYASHI, Kouichi, @c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 17-1, Towada, Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | [2013/12] |
Former [2006/20] | 01 /
HYOUDOU, Narutoshi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 1-1, Kurosakishiroishi, Yahatanishi-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 806-0004 / JP | ||
02 /
TANAKA, Tatsuo, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 17-1, Towada, Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | |||
03 /
HAYASHI, Kouichi, c/o Mitsubishi Chemical Corp. 17-1, Towada, Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun, Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/15] |
Former [2013/12] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/20] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772002.4 | 17.08.2004 | [2006/20] | WO2004JP12041 | Priority number, date | JP20030297844 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003297844 | JP20030297719 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003297719 | JP20030297832 | 21.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003297832 | JP20030382667 | 12.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003382667 | JP20030382773 | 12.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003382773 | JP20030382646 | 12.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003382646 | [2006/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019302 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1657272 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1657272 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1657272 | Date: | 08.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08G64/30 | [2006/20] | CPC: |
C08G64/307 (EP);
Y02P20/582 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, HU [2020/15] |
Former [2006/37] | DE, HU | ||
Former [2006/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON AROMATISCHEM POLYCARBONAT | [2006/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING AROMATIC POLYCARBONATE | [2006/20] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE POLYCARBONATE AROMATIQUE | [2006/20] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2006 | Translation filed | 14.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/20] | 22.03.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2006 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
10.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
10.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. F.a.o. Mr. Frederik Grever P.O. Box 117 4600AC Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Modiano, Micaela Nadia Modiano Josif Pisanty & Staub Ltd Thierschstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2013
10.01.2014
ADMISSIBLE SABIC Innovative Plastics IP B.V. F.a.o. Mr. Frederik Grever P.O. Box 117 4600AC Bergen op Zoom / NL Opponent's representative Grever, Frederik SABIC innovative Plastics IP B.V. P.O. Box 117 4600AC Bergen op Zoom / NL | 28.01.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.06.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.03.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 17.11.2019 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.02.2020 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 29.04.2016 | Appeal received No. T1044/16 | 17.05.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.11.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9303084 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [A] 1-44 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]LU88564 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-44 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]LU88569 (BAYER AG [DE]) [A] 1-44* claims 1-3 * | International search | [A]US6277945 (HACHIYA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [A]US5717609 (PACKA DANIEL E [US], et al) | by applicant | JPH09165443 | JP2002322130 | JPH05331088 | JPH0938402 | US6277945 | LU88564 | LU88569 |