EP1716746 - WORKING TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wakasaya Corporation 3-7-45, Ishigami Sanjo-shi Niigata 9550084 / JP | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOYAMA, Hideo; c/o Wakasaya Corporation 3-7-45, Ishigami, Sanjo- shi, Niigata; 9550084 / JP | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstraße 7 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Thun, Clemens Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772161.8 | 25.08.2004 | [2006/44] | WO2004JP12200 | Priority number, date | JP20030426640 | 24.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003426640 | [2006/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005060732 | Date: | 07.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716746 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01G3/02, B25B7/14, B26B13/12, B26B13/28 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B25B7/18 (EP,US);
A01G3/02 (EP,US);
B25B7/14 (EP,US);
B26B13/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARBEITSWERKZEUG | [2006/44] | English: | WORKING TOOL | [2006/44] | French: | OUTIL DE TRAVAIL | [2006/44] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2006 | Translation filed | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Search fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/01] | 18.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE912080 (HANS SCHAEFER, et al) [A] 1-5* figure -; claim - *; | [XA]DE3830934 (POGGETTI PIETRO [IT]) [X] 1,4,5 * column 3, line 67 - column 5, line 40; figure - * [A] 2,3 | International search | [X]JPH0780164 (SHIGERU KOGYO KK); | [A]JPH10244081 (SAGO NORIO); | [A]JPS5628858U |