EP1666119 - HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR CLARIFYING EXHAUST GAS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohcera Co., Ltd. 1-19, Uchihonmachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-0026 / JP | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Tsutomu 785-1, Kunikane, Kamiso-cho, Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 6751213 / JP | 02 /
FUKUDA, Masahiro 94-1-603, Ochiai, Makishima-cho, Uji-shi, Kyoto 6110041 / JP | 03 /
FUKUDA, Masaaki 785-1, Kunikane, Kamiso-cho, Kakogawa-shi, Hyogo 6751213 / JP | 04 /
YOKO, Toshinobu 31-1-120, Todomonnomae, Uji-shi, Kyoto 6110013 / JP | 05 /
TAKAHASHI, Masahide Kyodai Shokuinshukusha 1-113, Gokasho Kanyuchi Uji-shi, Kyoto 6110011 / JP | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwälte Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Hartz, Nikolai Wächtershauser & Hartz Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772268.1 | 20.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004JP12312 | Priority number, date | JP20030208356 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003208356 | [2006/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018776 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1666119 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1666119 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B01D39/20, C04B35/478 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C04B35/478 (EP,US);
B01D39/20 (KR);
B01D39/2068 (EP,US);
C04B35/62665 (EP,US);
C04B35/6303 (EP,US);
F01N3/0222 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3201 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3222 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3231 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3236 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3472 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/96 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9607 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US);
Y10S264/48 (EP,US);
Y10S55/05 (EP,US);
Y10S55/10 (EP,US);
Y10S55/30 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24149 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WABENFILTER ZUR REINIGUNG VON ABGAS UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2006/23] | English: | HONEYCOMB FILTER FOR CLARIFYING EXHAUST GAS AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURE THEREOF | [2006/23] | French: | FILTRE EN NID D'ABEILLE POUR CLARIFIER DES GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT ET SON PROCEDE DE REALISATION | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | Translation filed | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.05.2009 | BE | 06.05.2009 | CY | 06.05.2009 | CZ | 06.05.2009 | DK | 06.05.2009 | EE | 06.05.2009 | FI | 06.05.2009 | IT | 06.05.2009 | NL | 06.05.2009 | PL | 06.05.2009 | RO | 06.05.2009 | SI | 06.05.2009 | SK | 06.05.2009 | TR | 06.05.2009 | BG | 06.08.2009 | SE | 06.08.2009 | GR | 07.08.2009 | ES | 17.08.2009 | IE | 20.08.2009 | LU | 20.08.2009 | CH | 31.08.2009 | LI | 31.08.2009 | MC | 31.08.2009 | PT | 06.09.2009 | HU | 07.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.08.2009 | ||
LU | 20.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
HU | 07.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.08.2009 | ||
LU | 20.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
IT | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
GR | 07.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
IE | 20.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.08.2009 | ||
LI | 31.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
BG | 06.08.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
BE | 06.05.2009 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2009 | ||
DK | 06.05.2009 | ||
EE | 06.05.2009 | ||
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
RO | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SK | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/01] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
PL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 06.05.2009 | |
FI | 06.05.2009 | ||
NL | 06.05.2009 | ||
SI | 06.05.2009 | ||
SE | 06.08.2009 | ||
ES | 17.08.2009 | ||
PT | 06.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | ES | 17.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0335681 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, lines 7,8; claim - *; | [A]EP0724126 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,6,7* claim - *; | [A]EP0873775 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * claim - *; | [Y]US2003015829 (FUKUDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7 * claim - * | International search | [Y]JPH05306614 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH08290963 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH0910527 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JPH0929024 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) |