EP1640350 - COMPOSITION FOR CERAMIC SUBSTRATE, CERAMIC SUBSTRATE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CERAMIC SUBSTRATE AND GLASS COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKADA, Takahiro, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 6178555 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Hirobumi, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1 ,Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 6178555 / JP | 03 /
KAGEYAMA, Keisuke, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1 ,Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 6178555 / JP | [2011/47] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
TAKADA, Takahiro, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1 Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 6178555 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMAMOTO, Hirobumi, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1 ,Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 6178555 / JP | |||
03 /
KAGEYAMA, Keisuke, Murata Manufacturing Co., Ltd 10-1 ,Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 6178555 / JP | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/13] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772607.0 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/13] | WO2004JP12651 | Priority number, date | JP20040024099 | 30.01.2004 Original published format: JP 2004024099 | [2006/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005073146 | Date: | 11.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640350 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640350 | Date: | 23.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/00, C04B35/50, C03C10/02, H01B3/12, H05K3/46 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
H05K1/0306 (EP,US);
C04B35/00 (KR);
C03C10/00 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/15 (EP,US);
C04B35/01 (EP,US);
C04B35/50 (KR);
H01B3/12 (KR);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3227 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3251 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3284 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR KERAMIKSUBSTRAT, KERAMIKSUBSTRAT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMIKSUBSTRAT UND GLASZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/13] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR CERAMIC SUBSTRATE, CERAMIC SUBSTRATE, PROCESS FOR PRODUCING CERAMIC SUBSTRATE AND GLASS COMPOSITION | [2006/13] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SUBSTRAT CERAMIQUE, SUBSTRAT CERAMIQUE, PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION DE SUBSTRAT CERAMIQUE ET COMPOSITION DE VERRE | [2006/13] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2005 | Translation filed | 11.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 07.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.09.2004 | AT | 23.11.2011 | BE | 23.11.2011 | CY | 23.11.2011 | CZ | 23.11.2011 | DK | 23.11.2011 | EE | 23.11.2011 | FI | 23.11.2011 | IT | 23.11.2011 | NL | 23.11.2011 | PL | 23.11.2011 | RO | 23.11.2011 | SE | 23.11.2011 | SI | 23.11.2011 | SK | 23.11.2011 | TR | 23.11.2011 | BG | 23.02.2012 | GR | 24.02.2012 | ES | 05.03.2012 | PT | 23.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
TR | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
FI | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
ES | 05.03.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.11.2011 | |
BE | 23.11.2011 | ||
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
IT | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
PL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
RO | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
SK | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
DK | 23.11.2011 | ||
EE | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
BG | 23.02.2012 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
CY | 23.11.2011 | ||
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 23.11.2011 | |
NL | 23.11.2011 | ||
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 23.11.2011 | |
SE | 23.11.2011 | ||
SI | 23.11.2011 | ||
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 23.11.2011 | |
GR | 24.02.2012 | ||
PT | 23.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH07135379 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO); | [A]JPH10297960 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JPH10330161 (FUJI ELECTROCHEMICAL CO LTD) |