EP1806799 - TITANIUM BASED MATERIAL FOR FUEL CELL SEPARATOR AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2017 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel & Sumitomo Metal Corporation 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2013/04] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0041 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARUTANI, Yoshio, c/oSUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES Ltd 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5410041 / JP | 02 /
SEKI, Akira c/o SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 5410041 / JP | 03 /
MAEDA, Takashi, c/o SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5410041 / JP | 04 /
TAKAHASHI, Wataru, c/oSUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES Ltd 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5410041 / JP | 05 /
DOI, Takashi, c/o SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES, Ltd. 5-33, Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 5410041 / JP | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/38] | Simons, Amanda Louise J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/28] | Simons, Amanda Louise J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04772710.2 | 27.08.2004 | [2007/28] | WO2004JP12761 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006022027 | Date: | 02.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806799 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1806799 | Date: | 21.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C22C14/00, C22C32/00, H01M8/0208, H01M8/0226, H01M8/0228 | [2016/19] | CPC: |
H01M8/0206 (EP,US);
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
C22C32/0073 (EP,US);
H01M8/0204 (EP,US);
H01M8/0208 (EP,US);
H01M8/0226 (EP,US);
H01M8/0228 (EP,US);
H01M8/10 (EP,US);
H01M2008/1095 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2016/17] | C22C14/00, H01M8/10, C22C32/00, H01M8/0204, H01M8/0206, H01M8/0208, H01M8/0226, H01M8/0228, // H01M8/1018 | ||
Former IPC [2007/28] | H01M8/02, H01M8/10, C22C14/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/38] |
Former [2007/47] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF TITAN BASIERENDES MATERIAL FÜR EIN BRENNSTOFFZELLENTRENNGLIED UND PROZESS ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2007/28] | English: | TITANIUM BASED MATERIAL FOR FUEL CELL SEPARATOR AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2007/28] | French: | MATÉRIAU À BASE DE TITANE POUR SÉPARATEUR DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2016/19] |
Former [2007/28] | MATÉRIAU À BASE DE TITANE POUR SÉPARATEUR DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCESSUS DE PRODUCTION | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2007 | Translation filed | 22.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 28.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 23.10.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH055142 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV) [X] 1-3* abstract *; | [X]JPH08100229 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5955207 (LEDERICH RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 6, line 22 - column 8, line 67 *; | [X]US6117204 (SAITO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * figure 6; examples 1-9; claims 1-7 * | International search | [AE]JP2004273370 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JP2001357862 (SUMITOMO METAL IND); | [A]JP2002025579 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH11162479 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) |