EP1662512 - MIXED ION CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANIGUCHI, Noboru 2-8-22-601, Sentai, Sumiyoshi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 558-0047 / JP | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/22] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04772842.3 | 30.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004JP12893 | Priority number, date | JP20030311720 | 03.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003311720 | [2006/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005024850 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662512 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662512 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/12, H01M8/12, C04B35/626, C01G15/00, C04B35/50, C04B35/01 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
C04B35/50 (EP,US);
H01B1/08 (KR);
C01G15/006 (EP,US);
C04B35/01 (EP,US);
C04B35/6262 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M8/1246 (EP,US);
C01P2002/34 (EP,US);
C01P2002/77 (EP,US);
C01P2006/40 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3229 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3232 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3286 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/449 (EP,US);
C04B2235/656 (EP,US);
C04B2235/76 (EP,US);
C04B2235/761 (EP,US);
C04B2235/762 (EP,US);
C04B2235/765 (EP,US);
C04B2235/768 (EP,US);
C04B2235/77 (EP,US);
C04B2235/786 (EP,US);
C04B2235/79 (EP,US);
C04B2235/81 (EP,US);
C04B2235/9669 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02P70/50 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/07] | H01B1/08, H01M8/02, C01G15/00, C01G23/00, C01G25/00, G01N27/409, C04B35/50 | ||
Former IPC [2006/22] | H01B1/08, H01M8/02, C01G15/00, C01G23/00, C01G25/00, G01N27/409 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | MISCHIONENLEITER | [2006/22] | English: | MIXED ION CONDUCTOR | [2006/22] | French: | CONDUCTEUR MIXTE IONIQUE | [2013/30] |
Former [2006/22] | CONDUCTEUR MIXTE | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2005 | Translation filed | 21.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 21.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 13.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.08.2004 | AT | 24.07.2013 | BE | 24.07.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | CY | 24.07.2013 | CZ | 24.07.2013 | DK | 24.07.2013 | EE | 24.07.2013 | ES | 24.07.2013 | FI | 24.07.2013 | IT | 24.07.2013 | MC | 24.07.2013 | NL | 24.07.2013 | PL | 24.07.2013 | RO | 24.07.2013 | SE | 24.07.2013 | SI | 24.07.2013 | SK | 24.07.2013 | TR | 24.07.2013 | IE | 30.08.2013 | LU | 30.08.2013 | CH | 31.08.2013 | LI | 31.08.2013 | FR | 24.09.2013 | GB | 24.10.2013 | GR | 25.10.2013 | PT | 25.11.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
TR | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 24.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
FR | 24.09.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GB | 24.10.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
IE | 30.08.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
IT | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
EE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
SK | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
RO | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
DK | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
MC | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.08.2013 | ||
LI | 31.08.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
CY | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
NL | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
ES | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SI | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.10.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
FI | 24.07.2013 | ||
PL | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 10.07.2013 | |
AT | 24.07.2013 | ||
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.07.2013 | |
BE | 24.07.2013 | ||
SE | 24.07.2013 | ||
PT | 25.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | PT | 25.11.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2001307546 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [AD] 1-14 * abstract * * table 1 *; | [A]US6361584 (STEVENS WARD C [US], et al) [A] 1-14* column 13; claims 23-30,44 * | International search | [X]JPH06186193 (NORITAKE CO LTD); | [X]JPH08327592 (TOYOTA CENTRAL RES & DEV); | [X] - NIWA J. ET AL., "Ba2InCeO5-6 kei no kozo to denki tokusei", THE ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN DAI 68 KAI TAIKAI KOEN YOSHISHU, (20010325), page 173, XP002985776 |