EP1668085 - INK FOR INKJET PRINTING, INK SET FOR INKJET PRINTING, INKJET RECORDING MATERIAL AND PRODUCING METHOD FOR INKJET RECORDING MATERIAL, AND INKJET RECORDING METHOD. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. No. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken 250-0123 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Toshiki, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200, , Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-8666 / JP | 02 /
NAGATA, Kozo, Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 200, Onakazato Fujinomiya-shi, Shizuoka 418-8666 / JP | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04773582.4 | 28.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004JP14558 | Priority number, date | JP20030336992 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003336992 | JP20030337852 | 29.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003337852 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005030888 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668085 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, B41M5/00, D21H19/36 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
C09D11/328 (EP,US);
C09D11/30 (KR);
B41J2/01 (KR);
B41M5/00 (KR);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
C09D11/40 (EP,KR,US);
D21H19/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5236 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTE FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK, TINTENKOMBINATION FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK, TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSMATERIAL SOWIE TINTENSTRAHLAUFZEICHNUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/24] | English: | INK FOR INKJET PRINTING, INK SET FOR INKJET PRINTING, INKJET RECORDING MATERIAL AND PRODUCING METHOD FOR INKJET RECORDING MATERIAL, AND INKJET RECORDING METHOD. | [2006/24] | French: | ENCRE POUR IMPRESSION JET D'ENCRE, ENSEMBLE D'ENCRES POUR IMPRESSION JET D'ENCRE, SUPPORT D'IMPRESSION JET D'ENCRE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SUPPORT D'IMPRESSION JET D'ENCRE, ET PROCEDE D'IMPRESSION JET D'ENCRE. | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 12.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Divisional application(s) | EP11190910.7 / EP2436740 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0559324 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,13 * example -; claim 9 *; | [X]US5462590 (YUI TOSHITAKE [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * example 1 *; | [X]US5785745 (LAUW HIANG P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * column 11, line 20 - line 29; claim - *; | [X]EP1236778 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1-4,13* example -; claim - *; | [X]WO03066756 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,13 * page 70; example -; claim - *; | [PX]EP1378550 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-4,13 * page 30; example -; claim - *; | [E]EP1473336 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-4,13 * page 63; example -; claim - * | International search | [X]JP2003220758 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [X]JP2003266663 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND); | [X]JP2003238863 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2003276306 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [X]JP2003191607 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |