EP1702519 - PROCESS FOR STERILIZATION AND PRODUCTION OF FISH MEAT PASTE PRODUCT WITH USE OF MICROBUBBLE AND STERILE FISH MEAT PASTE PRODUCT OBTAINED BY THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shirade, Seizou 4-29, Tate-Machi 2-Chome Ishimaki-City Miyagi 9860824 / JP | [2006/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shirade, Tetsuya 4-29, Tate-Machi 2-Chome Ishimaki-City, Miyagi 9860824 / JP | [2006/38] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/38] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04773693.9 | 01.10.2004 | [2006/38] | WO2004JP14895 | Priority number, date | JP20030357424 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003357424 | [2006/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005036992 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1702519 | Date: | 20.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1702519 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/325, A23B4/16, A23L3/3409 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
A23B4/16 (EP,US);
A23L17/00 (KR);
A23L17/70 (EP,US);
A23L3/3409 (EP,US);
A23L3/3445 (KR);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/10, A23V2250/128 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/38] | A23L1/325 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STERILISATION UND HERSTELLUNG EINES FISCHFLEISCHPASTEN-PRODUKTS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MIKROBLÄSCHEN, SOWIE SO ERHALTENES STERILES FISCHFLEISCHPASTEN-PRODUKT | [2006/38] | English: | PROCESS FOR STERILIZATION AND PRODUCTION OF FISH MEAT PASTE PRODUCT WITH USE OF MICROBUBBLE AND STERILE FISH MEAT PASTE PRODUCT OBTAINED BY THE PROCESS | [2006/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE STERILISATION ET DE PRODUCTION D'UN PRODUIT SOUS FORME DE PATE DE CHAIR DE POISSON A L'AIDE DE MICROBULLES ET PRODUIT SOUS FORME DE PATE DE CHAIR DE POISSON STERILE OBTENU SELON LEDIT PROCEDE | [2006/38] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2006 | Translation filed | 15.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 15.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPS56121462 (NIPPON KATSUSEIHA KK) [Y] 1-8,10 * abstract * [A] 9; | [A]US5783242 (TEAGUE FRED B [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [YA]US5858430 (ENDICO FELIX W [US]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 4, line 48 - column 5, line 18; figures 1, 2 * [A] 9; | [YA]US6200618 (SMITH DURAND M [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 2, line 18 - line 25; claims 9, 20 * * column 3, line 54 - line 58 * [A] 9; | [A]WO0167877 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [YA]US6379633 (GARLICK TODD [US]) [Y] 1-8,10 * column 4, line 18 - line 43; claims 1-3 * [A] 9 | International search | [Y]JPS62289164 (KIBUN KK); | [Y]JPS56121462 (NIPPON KATSUSEIHA KK); | [Y]JPH07236461 (KANKYO KAGAKU KOGYO KK) |