EP1683946 - EXHAUST PURIFIER FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD OF EXHAUST PURIFICATION FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKATANI, Koichiro, TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 4718571 / JP | [2011/51] |
Former [2006/30] | 01 /
NAKATANI, K., TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 4718571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/52] |
Former [2008/27] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/30] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, et al Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04773732.5 | 06.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004JP15103 | Priority number, date | JP20030357668 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003357668 | [2006/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005038206 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683946 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1683946 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/24, F01N3/08, F01N3/20, F02D45/00, F01N3/02 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
F01N3/206 (EP,US);
F01N3/24 (KR);
F01N13/011 (EP,US);
F01N3/08 (KR);
F01N3/0842 (EP,US);
F01N3/0871 (EP,US);
F01N3/0878 (EP,US);
F01N2410/00 (EP,US);
F01N2610/03 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/04] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ABGASREINIGER FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG FÜR VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2006/30] | English: | EXHAUST PURIFIER FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE AND METHOD OF EXHAUST PURIFICATION FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2006/30] | French: | PURIFICATEUR D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE ET PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION D'ECHAPPEMENT POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2005 | Translation filed | 16.08.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2005 | Search fee paid | 16.08.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2005 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 28.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19626837 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-23 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 62 - page 5, line 33 *; | [A]US5974791 (HIROTA SHINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * figure 1 * * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 65 * * column 7, line 25 - line 63 * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 8 * * column 9, line 47 - column 10, line 8 *; | [A]US6105365 (DEEBA MICHEL [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * figures 1-3 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 38 * * column 7, line 28 - column 9, line 26 *; | [A]FR2819549 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-23 * figure 1 ** page 10, line 32 - page 13, line 14 * | International search | [A]JPH03175112 (NIIGATA ENGINEERING CO LTD); | [A]JPH06235318 (RIKEN KK); | [A]JP2000240429 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2000282843 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JPS62106826 | JPH06200740 | JP2000240428 | JP2000345831 |