EP1797056 - PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF GLYCIDYL DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RStech Corporation 306 Venture Town Jangyoungsilgwan 1688-5, Sinil-dong Daeduk-gu Daejeon 306-230 / KR | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Ho-Seong 506-603, Expo Apt., Jeonmin-dong, Yusung-ku Daejeon 305-762 / KR | 02 /
YUN, Jin-Won 103, Ailhousing, 206-2, Bongsan-dong, Yusung-ku Daejeon 305-506 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seong-Jin 607-1504, Yeolmaemaeul, 880, Jijok-dong Yusung-ku, Deajeon 305-330 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Ho-Cheol 103, Ailhousing, 206-2, Bongsan-dong, Yusung-ku Deajeon 305-506 / KR | [2007/25] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/25] | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04774356.2 | 19.08.2004 | [2007/25] | WO2004KR02093 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006019202 | Date: | 23.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1797056 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D303/16 | [2007/25] | CPC: |
C07D303/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GLYCIDYLDERIVATEN | [2007/25] | English: | PROCESS FOR THE PREPARATION OF GLYCIDYL DERIVATIVES | [2007/25] | French: | METHODE DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES DE GLYCIDYLE | [2007/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 02.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 19.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3247227 (WHITE GEORGE T) [X] 12* column 3, line 16 - line 55 * | International search | [A]EP0884313 (DAISO CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US4946974 (SHARPLESS KARL B [US], et al); | [A]US5965753 (MASAKI MIDORI [JP], et al) | Examination | KR20040097443 |