EP1671062 - LIGHTING SYSTEM WITH MOVABLE LIGHTING, AS WELL AS A COMBINATION OF AT LEAST TWO LIGHTING SYSTEMS WITH MOVABLE LIGHTING, AS WELL AS A MEHOD FOR THE CULTIVATION OF A CROP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hortilux Schréder B.V. Groote Noort 11 NL-2681 dj Monster / NL | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN DOOL, Teunis, Cornelis Haagweg 33E NL-2681 PA Monster / NL | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2006/25] | van Westenbrugge, Andries Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 04775005.4 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004NL00710 | Priority number, date | NL20031024482 | 08.10.2003 Original published format: NL 1024482 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033580 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671062 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/34, A01G7/04 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
F21V21/34 (EP);
A01G7/045 (US);
A01G9/249 (EP);
F21S2/00 (EP,US);
F21V21/005 (EP);
F21Y2103/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, NL [2007/03] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEM MIT BEWEGLICHER BELEUCHTUNG SOWIE EINE KOMBINATION AUS MINDESTENS ZWEI BELEUCHTUNGSSYSTEMEN MIT BEWEGLICHER BELEUCHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM GETREIDEANBAU | [2006/25] | English: | LIGHTING SYSTEM WITH MOVABLE LIGHTING, AS WELL AS A COMBINATION OF AT LEAST TWO LIGHTING SYSTEMS WITH MOVABLE LIGHTING, AS WELL AS A MEHOD FOR THE CULTIVATION OF A CROP | [2006/25] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECLAIRAGE AVEC DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE MOBILE, COMBINAISON D'AU MOINS DEUX SYSTEMES D'ECLAIRAGE AVEC DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE MOBILE AINSI QUE PROCEDE DE CULTURE | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 15.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/09] | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9964786 (J J AGROTECH B V [NL], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7,10-14 * page 3, line 29 - line 31 * * page 4, line 24 - line 25 * * page 6, line 31 - line 33 * * page 7, line 28 - line 31 * * page 8, line 14 - line 19 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 3 * * claims 11,16 * * figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [Y]NL7613233 (GEEST VERWARMINGSTECHNIEK B V) [Y] 1-3,5-7,10-14 * page 5, line 2 - line 9 * * page 6, line 5 - line 14 * * page 6, line 30 - line 35 * * page 7, line 5 - line 9 * * figure - *; | [Y]US4441145 (ANTKOWIAK RUSSELL J [US]) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5993030 (BARCEL BARTON J [US]) [Y] 13 * column 3, line 9 - line 62 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6212823 (ORAM JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1,13,14 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 29 * * figures 1c,1e,5 * * claims 2,5,20 *; | [A]DE867473 (KIND WILM DIPL-ING) [A] 1,13,14 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9964786 | US5993030 |