EP1682441 - A TOOL FOR CONNECTION AND DISCONNECTION OF CARGO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLAUG, Ole Tytebaerholen 30 N-4340 Bryne / NO | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Neilson, Martin Mark Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Studio 3 84 Albion Street Leeds LS1 6AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Neilson, Martin Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Pawlyn, Anthony Neil Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04775093.0 | 27.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004NO00325 | Priority number, date | NO20030004842 | 28.10.2003 Original published format: NO 20034842 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005040032 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682441 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682441 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B66C1/38, B66C1/36 | [2009/11] | CPC: |
B66C1/38 (EP,US);
F16B45/021 (EP,US);
F16B45/026 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/30] | B66C1/38, B66C1/36, // F16B45/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERKZEUG ZUR VERBINDUNG UND TRENNUNG VON FRACHT | [2006/30] | English: | A TOOL FOR CONNECTION AND DISCONNECTION OF CARGO | [2006/30] | French: | OUTIL UTILE POUR ATTACHER ET DETACHER UNE CARGAISON | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 05.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.07.2009 | BE | 01.07.2009 | CY | 01.07.2009 | CZ | 01.07.2009 | DK | 01.07.2009 | EE | 01.07.2009 | FI | 01.07.2009 | IT | 01.07.2009 | NL | 01.07.2009 | PL | 01.07.2009 | RO | 01.07.2009 | SE | 01.07.2009 | SI | 01.07.2009 | SK | 01.07.2009 | TR | 01.07.2009 | BG | 01.10.2009 | GR | 02.10.2009 | ES | 12.10.2009 | GB | 27.10.2009 | IE | 27.10.2009 | LU | 27.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | PT | 02.11.2009 | HU | 02.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
GB | 27.10.2009 | ||
IE | 27.10.2009 | ||
LU | 27.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
HU | 02.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
GB | 27.10.2009 | ||
IE | 27.10.2009 | ||
LU | 27.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
IT | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
GB | 27.10.2009 | ||
IE | 27.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
GB | 27.10.2009 | ||
IE | 27.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
GR | 02.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
IE | 27.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
BE | 01.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
SK | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
CZ | 01.07.2009 | ||
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
RO | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
DK | 01.07.2009 | ||
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
BG | 01.10.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
PT | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | AT | 01.07.2009 | |
EE | 01.07.2009 | ||
FI | 01.07.2009 | ||
NL | 01.07.2009 | ||
PL | 01.07.2009 | ||
SE | 01.07.2009 | ||
SI | 01.07.2009 | ||
ES | 12.10.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | SI | 01.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4095833 (LEWIS CHARLES B); | [X]US4416480 (MOODY JACK M [US]); | [X]WO8607582 (RAMNAES KONSTR TEK AB [SE]); | [X]DE3801483 (SUDHOP HELMUT DIPL ING [DE]); | [X]DE3938364 (HOLSTE DIETER [DE]) | by applicant | US4416480 |