EP1625144 - POLYVALENT IMMUNOGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Duke University Office of Science and Technology, P.O. Box 90083 Durham, NC 27708-0083 / US | [2006/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYNES, Barton, c/o Duke University Box 90083, Office of Science and Technology Durham, NC 27708-0083 / US | 02 /
SPICER, Leonard D., c/o Duke University Box 90083, Office of Science and Technology Durham, NC 27708-0083 / US | [2006/07] | Representative(s) | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/07] | Atkinson, Peter Birch, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 04776044.2 | 19.05.2004 | [2006/07] | WO2004US15735 | Priority number, date | US20030471327P | 19.05.2003 Original published format: US 471327 P | [2006/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005016952 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1625144 | Date: | 15.02.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/21, C12N5/10, C07K14/16 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16322 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | A61K39/21, C12N5/10 | ||
Former IPC [2006/07] | C07K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYVALENTES IMMUNOGEN | [2006/07] | English: | POLYVALENT IMMUNOGEN | [2006/07] | French: | IMMUNOGENE POLYVALENT | [2006/07] | Entry into regional phase | 05.10.2005 | National basic fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Search fee paid | 05.10.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.10.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 05.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/07] | 31.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/02] | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO03046137 (UNIV DUKE [US], et al); | International search | [X]US5420030 (REITZ JR MARVIN S [US], et al); | [X]US5807979 (SATTERTHWAIT JR ARNOLD C [US], et al); |