EP1635691 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN DIAGNOSING AND CHARACTERIZING DISEASES INVOLVING ABNORMAL APOPTOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.E.D. Laboratories N.V. Pontbeek 61 1731 Zellik / BE | [2006/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGLEBIENNE, Patrick Strijpstraat 21 B-9750 Zingem / BE | 02 /
DE MEIRLEIR, Kenny, Leo Stuivenbergbaan 89 B-2800 Mechelen / BE | 03 /
HERST, Charles, Vincent 5735 Clover Drive Oakland, CA 94618 / US | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04776160.6 | 26.05.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004US16901 | Priority number, date | US20030473690P | 27.05.2003 Original published format: US 473690 P | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005009203 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635691 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/48, C12Q1/70, G01N33/68, G01N33/50 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/56983 (EP,US);
G01N2333/4712 (EP,US);
G01N2510/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | G01N33/48, C12Q1/70 | ||
Former IPC [2006/12] | A61B1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER DIAGNOSE UND CHARAKTERISIERUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN MIT ABNORMALER APOPTOSE | [2006/12] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE IN DIAGNOSING AND CHARACTERIZING DISEASES INVOLVING ABNORMAL APOPTOSIS | [2006/12] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS A UTILISER DANS LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LA CARACTERISATION DES MALADIES IMPLIQUANT UNE APOPTOSE ANORMALE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 06.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/37] | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA] - YANG F ET AL, "ANTIBODY TO CASPASE-CLEAVED ACTIN DETECTS APOPTOSIS IN DIFFERENTIATED NEUROBLASTOMA AND PLAQUE-ASSOCIATED NEURONS AND MICROGLIA IN ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, USA, (199802), vol. 152, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 379 - 389, XP009037701 [X] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-8 | [X] - CYTOSKELETON INC, G-actin / F-actin in vivo assay kit, DENVER, COLORADO, USA, (1993), XP002473343 [X] 9,10 * last line of flyer & kit contents* | International search | [X]WO0188543 (R E D LAB N V [BE]); | [A] - DEVIREDDY L.R. AND JONES C.J., "Activation of Caspases and p53 by Bovine Herpesvirus 1 Infection Results in Programmed Cell Death and Efficient Virus Release", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199905), vol. 73, no. 5, pages 3778 - 3788, XP002993011 |