EP1636972 - THROUGH-THE-EARTH RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California Los Alamos National Laboratory LC/IP, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California Los Alamos National Laboratory, LC/IP, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | ||
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California Los Alamos National Laboratory, LC/IP, MS A187 Los Alamos, NM 87545 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REAGOR, David, W. 500 Brighton Drive Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | 02 /
VAZQUEZ-DOMINGUEZ, Jose 600 San Idelfonso Los Alamos, NM 87544 / US | [2006/12] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | [2014/32] |
Former [2010/34] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2009/50] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | ||
Former [2006/12] | Wilson Gunn Charles House 148/9 Great Charles Street GB-Birmingham B3 3HT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04776406.3 | 08.06.2004 | [2006/12] | WO2004US18355 | Priority number, date | US20030483146P | 26.06.2003 Original published format: US 483146 P | US20030719426 | 20.11.2003 Original published format: US 719426 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005002066 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1636972 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1636972 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04B13/02 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
H04B13/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/12] | H04M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/12] | Title | German: | FUNK DURCH DIE ERDE | [2006/12] | English: | THROUGH-THE-EARTH RADIO | [2006/12] | French: | RADIO A TRAVERS LA TERRE | [2006/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/12] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2004 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
SE | 06.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0004662 (NIELSEN MEDIA RES INC [US]) [A] 1,10,19 * page 16, paragraph 2 - page 18, paragraph 1 ** figures 1,9 *; | [A] - REAGOR D ET AL, "A high-temperature superconducting receiver for low-frequency radio waves", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON APPLIED SUPERCONDUCTIVITY, USA, (19971201), vol. 7, no. 4, pages 3845 - 3849, XP002467894 [A] 1-23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/77.659437 | International search | [Y]US6088351 (JENKIN KEITH R [US], et al); | [YP]US2003016411 (ZHOU JINGYU [US], et al); | [A]US2003063014 (STOLARCZYK LARRY G [US]); | [YE]US2005176391 (BUTTERS BENNETT M [US]) | Examination | GB2251326 |