EP1642092 - METHOD FOR CALCULATION OF A PHASE SIGNAL IN A FIBER OPTIC SENSOR ARRAY WITH A PHASE GENERATED CARRIER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.12.2013 [2013/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. 21240 Burbank Blvd. Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. 21240 Burbank Blvd. Woodland Hills, CA 91367 / US | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 21240 Burbank Boulevard Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6675 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, David, B. 5165 Finehill Avenue La Crescenta, CA 91214-1206 / US | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04776738.9 | 18.06.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US19466 | Priority number, date | US20030615730 | 09.07.2003 Original published format: US 615730 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005010466 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1642092 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1642092 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/353 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
G01D5/35383 (EP,US);
H04B10/25 (KR);
H04J14/08 (KR);
H04L27/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/42] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KALKULATION EINES PHASENSIGNALS IN EINEM FASEROPTISCHEN SENSORARRAY MIT PHASENGENERIERTEM TRÄGER | [2006/14] | English: | METHOD FOR CALCULATION OF A PHASE SIGNAL IN A FIBER OPTIC SENSOR ARRAY WITH A PHASE GENERATED CARRIER | [2006/14] | French: | PROCEDE DE CALCUL D'UN SIGNAL DE PHASE DANS UN RESEAU DE CAPTEURS A FIBRE OPTIQUE COMPORTANT UNE ONDE PORTEUSE GENEREE PAR PHASE | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 08.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2006 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5903350 (BUSH IRA JEFFERY [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 40; figures 20-26 *; | [XY]US6122057 (HALL DAVID B [US]) [X] 1 * columns 1-4; figures 10-12 * [Y] 1-30; | [Y]US6134281 (GREEN JAMES D [US], et al) [Y] 1-30* column 6, lines 59-67; figures 1,6 * |