EP1644060 - SENSOR-EQUIPPED AND ALGORITHM-CONTROLLED DIRECT MECHANICAL VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Resuscitation, LLC Suite 215, 150 Lucius Gordon Drive West Henrietta, NY 14586 / US | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANSTADT, Mark, P. 501 Sylvandale Drive Dayton, OH 45419 / US | 02 /
ANSTADT, George, L. 6495 E. Agenboard Road Tipp City, OH 45371 / US | 03 /
MACDONALD, Stuart, G. 4663 East Lake Road Pultneyville, NY 14538 / US | 04 /
HELFER, Jeffrey, L. 4 Highland Green Victor, NY 14564 / US | 05 /
ANSTADT, George, W. 18 Rustic Pines Pittsford, NY 14534 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/15] | 01 /
ANSTADT, Mark, P. . . / US | ||
02 /
ANSTADT, George, L. . . / US | |||
03 /
MACDONALD, Stuart, G. . . / US | |||
04 /
HELFER, Jeffrey, L. . . / US | |||
05 /
ANSTADT, George, W. . . / US | Representative(s) | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Scott, Susan Margaret, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777156.3 | 25.06.2004 | [2006/15] | WO2004US20605 | Priority number, date | US20030607434 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: US 607434 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005000160 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1644060 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/10 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
A61M60/289 (EP,US);
A61M60/531 (EP,US);
A61M60/191 (EP,US);
A61M60/468 (EP,US);
A61M60/515 (EP,US);
A61M60/523 (EP,US);
A61F2/2481 (EP,US);
A61M2205/32 (EP,US);
A61M2205/33 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3303 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3331 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3334 (EP,US);
A61M2230/04 (EP,US);
A61M2230/202 (EP,US);
A61M2230/205 (EP,US);
A61N1/05 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIT SENSOR AUSGESTATTETE UND ALGORITHMUS-KONTROLLIERTE DIREKTE MECHANISCHE VENTRIKEL-UNTERSTÜTZUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2006/15] | English: | SENSOR-EQUIPPED AND ALGORITHM-CONTROLLED DIRECT MECHANICAL VENTRICULAR ASSIST DEVICE | [2006/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE VENTRICULAIRE MECANIQUE DIRECTE COMMANDE PAR ALGORITHME ET EQUIPE D'UN CAPTEUR | [2006/15] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 17.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/30] | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.07.2009 | 30.06.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5749839 (KOVACS STEPHEN G [US]) |