EP1660562 - CARBAZOLYL-FUNCTIONAL CYCLOSILOXANE, SILICONE COMPOSITION, AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 2200 West Salzburg Road Midland, MI 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Shihe 5601 Drake Street Midland, MI 48642 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Kyle, Diana, et al Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777179.5 | 28.06.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US20661 | Priority number, date | US20030496461P | 20.08.2003 Original published format: US 496461 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019307 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1660562 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/26 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
C09K11/06 (EP,US);
C08G77/26 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/04 (KR);
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
H10K85/40 (EP,US);
C09K2211/14 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1466 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K50/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBAZOLYLFUNKTIONELLES CYCLOSILOXAN, SILIKONZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ORGANISCHE LICHTEMITTIERENDE DIODE | [2006/22] | English: | CARBAZOLYL-FUNCTIONAL CYCLOSILOXANE, SILICONE COMPOSITION, AND ORGANIC LIGHT-EMITTING DIODE | [2006/22] | French: | CYCLOSILOXANE A GROUPE FONCTIONNEL CARBAZOLYLE, COMPOSITION DE SILICIUM, ET DIODE ELECTROLUMINESCENTE ORGANIQUE | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 21.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3541161 (BASF AG [DE]); |