EP1646629 - CYCLOPROPYL GROUP SUBSTITUTED OXAZOLIDINONE ANTIBIOTICS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | For all designated states Kyorin Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065 / US | ||
For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | |||
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065 / US | ||
For all designated states KYORIN PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. 5, Kanda Surugadai 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-8311 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUDA, Yasumichi 33-2, Utsukusigaoka 3-chome, Oyama Tochigi 329-0207 / JP | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB | ||
Former [2006/16] | Gillard, Richard Edward Elkington and Fife LLP, Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777196.9 | 29.06.2004 | [2006/16] | WO2004US20734 | Priority number, date | US20030483904P | 02.07.2003 Original published format: US 483904 P | US20040546984P | 24.02.2004 Original published format: US 546984 P | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005005398 | Date: | 20.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1646629 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1646629 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/14 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
C07D413/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/08 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/06 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Extension states | AL | 11.01.2006 | HR | Not yet paid | LT | 11.01.2006 | LV | 11.01.2006 | MK | 11.01.2006 | Title | German: | CYCLOPROPYLGRUPPENSUBSTITUIERTE OXAZOLIDINONANTIBIOTIKA UND DERIVATE DAVON | [2006/16] | English: | CYCLOPROPYL GROUP SUBSTITUTED OXAZOLIDINONE ANTIBIOTICS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF | [2006/16] | French: | ANTIBIOTIQUES A BASE D'OXAZOLIDINONE SUBSTITUEE PAR UN GROUPE CYCLIPROPYL ET DERIVES | [2006/16] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 12.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.06.2010 | BE | 23.06.2010 | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | IT | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | PL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | IE | 29.06.2010 | LU | 29.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | ES | 04.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | HU | 24.12.2010 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
LU | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
LU | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
LU | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
HU | 24.12.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 29.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
BE | 23.06.2010 | ||
CY | 23.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 23.06.2010 | |
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0352781 (DU PONT [US]) [DA] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * example 38 *; | [X]WO9413649 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * claim 1 * * page 64, line 20 - line 21 * * page 64, line 26 - line 27 *; | [X]US5523403 (BARBACHYN MICHAEL R [US]) [X] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * claim 1 * * column 46, line 1 - line 3 * * column 46, line 10 - line 12 *; | [A]US5736545 (GADWOOD ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1,2,7,8,10-15* column 1, line 43 - column 2, line 14 *; | [DX]WO0194342 (DONG A PHARM CO LTD [KR], et al) [DX] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * claim - * * examples 42,78,119,129,132,134,136,139,143,146,148 *; | [A]WO03027083 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [PX]WO2004048350 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * page 78, line 24 - page 79; claim 1 * * example 8 *; | [E]US2004147760 (THOMAS RICHARD CHARLES [US], et al) [E] 1,2,7,8,10-15 * examples 48-51,54-57,65,72,73 * * claim 70 * |