EP1648538 - MEDICAL DEVICE WITH ELASTOMERIC PENETRABLE WALL AND INNER SEAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSU Medical Corporation 101 Convention Center Drive, Suite 850 Las Vegas, Nevada 89109 / US | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UTTERBERG, David, S. 2033 First Ave., 3 Seattle, Washington 98121 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Schubert, Siegmar Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Schubert, Siegmar Patentanwälte Dannenberg Schubert Gudel Grosse Eschenheimer Strasse 39 60313 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 04777299.1 | 28.06.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US20974 | Priority number, date | US20030613922 | 03.07.2003 Original published format: US 613922 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007221 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648538 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M5/14 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A61M39/02 (EP,US);
A61M39/045 (EP,US);
A61M39/26 (EP,US);
A61M2039/1072 (EP,US);
A61M39/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT ELASTOMERER DURCHDRINGBARER WAND UND INNERE DICHTUNG | [2006/17] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICE WITH ELASTOMERIC PENETRABLE WALL AND INNER SEAL | [2006/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF MEDICAL PRESENTANT UNE PAROI ELASTOMERE PENETRABLE ET UN JOINT D'ETANCHEITE INTERIEUR | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 04.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/10] | 24.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   25.07.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2002002351 (COTE ANDREW L [US], et al) [I] 1-22* the whole document *; | [I]EP1217284 (TERUMO CORP [JP]) [I] 1-22 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5501426 (ATKINSON GORDON E [US]) |