EP1651974 - MULTICOIL NMR DATA ACQUISITION AND PROCESSING METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vista Clara, Inc. 12201 Cyrus Way, Suite 104 Mukilteo, WA 98275 / US | [2011/21] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states Walsh, David O. 8849 47th Place W. Mukilteo, WA 98275-3467 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Coyle, Philip Aidan FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Coyle, Philip Aidan FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2006/18] | DTS Zürich Resirain 1 8125 Zollikerberg/Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 04777777.6 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004US21911 | Priority number, date | US20030485689P | 09.07.2003 Original published format: US 485689 P | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017549 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651974 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651974 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/15] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1651974 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/483 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
G01R33/3415 (EP,US);
G01R33/44 (EP,US);
G01R33/4831 (EP,US);
G01V3/14 (EP,US);
G01R33/445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSPULEN-NMR-DATENERFASSUNGS- UND -BEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2006/18] | English: | MULTICOIL NMR DATA ACQUISITION AND PROCESSING METHODS | [2006/18] | French: | PROCEDES D'ACQUISITION ET DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES D'IRM A BOBINES MULTIPLES | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 12.03.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.03.2007 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 19.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2007 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request accepted | 29.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.04.2011 | BE | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HU | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | IE | 09.07.2011 | LU | 09.07.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | GB | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | CH | 31.07.2011 | LI | 31.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.07.2011 | ||
LU | 09.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.07.2011 | ||
LU | 09.07.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.07.2011 | ||
LU | 09.07.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 09.07.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GB | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
CH | 31.07.2011 | ||
LI | 31.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
BE | 13.04.2011 | ||
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 16.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0170508 (OXFORD RES SYST [GB]) [X] 1,12 * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 24 * * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 2 * * page 14, paragraph 1 - page 23, paragraph 1 * * figure 7 *; | [A]US5759152 (FELMLEE JOEL [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 44 * * column 4, line 23 - line 46 ** column 5, line 8 - line 60 *; | [A]US6160398 (WALSH DAVID O [US]) [A] 1-9 * column W *; | [A] - C.E. HAYES ET AL., "VOLUME IMAGING WITH MR PHASED ARRAYS", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (19910401), vol. 18, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 309 - 319, XP000209845 [A] 1-4,12-14 * pages 309 - 316: "Introduction" and "Methods" * | Examination | - WALSH D O ET AL, "Adaptive reconstruction of phased array MR imagery", INSPEC, THE INSTITUTION OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, (200005), Database accession no. 6626983 | - Magnetic Resonance in Medicine Wiley USA, vol. 43, no. 5, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 682 - 690 | by applicant | EP0170508 | US6160398 | - KATSCHER U. ET AL., "Transmit SENSE", MAG. RES. MED., (200301), vol. 49, pages 144 - 150 | - C.E. HAYES ET AL., "Volume Imaging with MR Phased Arrays", MAGN. RES. MED., (1991), vol. 18, pages 309 - 319 | - "Database", Database accession no. 6626983 | - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE WILEY USA, vol. 43, no. 5, pages 682 - 690 |