EP1641975 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVING LIGHT-FADE RESISTANCE AND SOIL REPELLENCY OF TEXTILES AND LEATHERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scheidler, Karl 1357 State Route 28 Loveland, OH 45140 / US | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | ||
Former [2006/14] | Findlay, Alice Rosemary Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04777797.4 | 08.07.2004 | [2006/14] | WO2004US21939 | Priority number, date | US20030485623P | 08.07.2003 Original published format: US 485623 P | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005007966 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641975 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06M15/277, D06M15/576, D06M15/643, D06M13/35, D06M13/358, D06N3/00, D06M13/213, D06M13/432, D06M13/352, D06M13/127, C14C9/00 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
D06M15/643 (EP,US);
C14C9/00 (EP,US);
D06M13/005 (EP,US);
D06M13/35 (EP,US);
D06M13/358 (EP,US);
D06M15/277 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER LICHTECHTHEIT UND DER SCHMUTZABWEISUNG VON TEXTILIEN UND LEDERN | [2006/14] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR IMPROVING LIGHT-FADE RESISTANCE AND SOIL REPELLENCY OF TEXTILES AND LEATHERS | [2006/14] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS AMELIORANT LA RESISTANCE A LA LUMIERE ET LA RESISTANCE AUX SALISSURES DES TEXTILES ET DES CUIRS | [2006/14] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2014 | 31.07.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0523956 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-12,16-19,21,23-27 * page 2, line 1 - line 9 * * page 4, line 12 - page 5, line 30 * * page 6, line 39 - line 50; claim - *; | [X]DE10021169 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-7,9,10,12-21,23,24,26,27 * page 2, line 1 - line 35 * * page 5, line 23 - line 48 * * page 6, line 65 - page 7, line 42 *; | [X]WO02079563 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,8-10,16,22-27 * page 14, line 1 - page 16, line 32; claim - * | Examination | US5143729 | US5374362 |