EP1652016 - SENSING AND CONTROL OF VALVE FLOW RATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EMERSON ELECTRIC CO. 8000 W. Florissant Avenue St. Louis Missouri 63136 / US | [2006/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYER, Ronald, W. 1513 Windriver Drive Arnold, MO 63010 / US | 02 /
HART, David, L. 260 Stillbrook Estates Drive Fenton, MO 63026 / US | [2006/18] | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2009/31] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Goodenough, Nigel, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04778049.9 | 09.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004US22342 | Priority number, date | US20030615734 | 09.07.2003 Original published format: US 615734 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005008132 | Date: | 27.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1652016 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1652016 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F16K31/04, G05D7/06, G01F1/684, G01F15/00 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
G01F1/6842 (EP,US);
F16K31/04 (EP,US);
G01F15/005 (EP,US);
G05D7/0635 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G05D23/00, G01F1/68 | ||
Former IPC [2006/18] | G05D23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2006/42] |
Former [2006/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MESSUNG UND REGELUNG DER VENTILSTRÖMUNGSGESCHWINDIGKEIT | [2006/18] | English: | SENSING AND CONTROL OF VALVE FLOW RATE | [2006/18] | French: | DETECTION ET REGULATION DE DEBIT DE SOUPAPE | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 29.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4384578 (WINKLER H EUGENE) [A] 1-29 * Abstract * * column 1, line 46 - column 2, line 2 ** figure 2 *; | [A]US5975126 (BUMP SCOTT S [US], et al) [A] 1-29 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 5 * * figures 2,3 *; | [Y]US6085588 (KHADKIKAR PRASAD S [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * abstract * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 26 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 3 * * claim 1 * * figure 1 *; | [A]WO0138789 (HONEYWELL INC [US]) [A] 1-29 * Abstract; page 5, line 11 - page 6, line 7 * * page 11, lines 2-6; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO03042586 (EMECH CONTROL LTD FORMERLY TEC [NZ], et al) [Y] 1-29 * Abstract * * page 4, lines 16-21 * * page 13, lines 11-13 * * figure 1 * | International search | [A]US4921210 (HUTCHISON DONALD W [US], et al); | [Y]US6032525 (SUETAKE NARUKI [JP]); | [A]US6085588 (KHADKIKAR PRASAD S [US], et al); | [A]US6349922 (RYDIN GOERAN [SE]); | [Y]US6389364 (VYERS EMMANUEL [US]); | [Y]US6419478 (KEMP STEPHEN J [US]) | by applicant | US4384589 | US5975126 | US6085588 | WO0138789 | WO03042586 |