EP1653889 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING MITRAL VALVE FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Viacor, Inc. 260-B Fordham Road WIlmington, MA 01887 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROURKE, Jonathan, M. 23 Locust Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 02 /
TAYLOR, Daniel, C. 35 Faneuil Street Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 03 /
BLACKER, Steven, J. 11 Gibbs Street, Apt. 3 Brookline, MA 02446 / US | 04 /
BARNES, Terrence, G. 18 Day Street, Apt. 407 Somerville, MA 02144 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Küchler, Stefan Stefan T. Küchler Patentanwalt Färberstraße 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Küchler, Stefan Patentanwalt Färberstrasse 20 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04778689.2 | 19.07.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US23315 | Priority number, date | US20030489549P | 23.07.2003 Original published format: US 489549 P | US20040562958P | 17.04.2004 Original published format: US 562958 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005009286 | Date: | 03.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1653889 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.08.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/2451 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0036 (EP,US);
A61M2025/004 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0063 (EP,US);
A61M25/0054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UDN GERÄT ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER MITRALKLAPPENFUNKTION | [2006/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPROVING MITRAL VALVE FUNCTION | [2006/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'AMELIORER LA FONCTION DE LA VALVULE MITRALE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6210432 (SOLEM JAN OTTO [SE], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02078576 (VIACOR INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,16,17,20-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003130730 (COHN WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7,16,20-22 * paragraphs [0071] - [0091] *; | [PX]WO03059198 (VIACOR INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,4,7,16-23* the whole document * | International search | [Y]US4917698 (CARPENTIER ALAIN [FR], et al); | [A]US5195972 (INOUE KANJI [JP]); | [A]US5509900 (KIRKMAN THOMAS R [US]); | [A]US5743875 (SIRHAN MOTASIM M [US], et al); | [X]US6102945 (CAMPBELL LOUIS A [US]); | [X]US6210432 (SOLEM JAN OTTO [SE], et al) | by applicant | WO02078576 | US2003130730 |