EP1711512 - PROCESS FOR PURIFYING PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320 / US | [2006/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENCZUK, Anna 19110 Stone Avenue North Shoreline, WA 98133 / US | 02 /
KLINKE, Ralph 23841 SE 30th Street Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | [2006/42] | Representative(s) | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/03] | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2006/42] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04778787.4 | 21.07.2004 | [2006/42] | WO2004US23434 | Priority number, date | US20040540587P | 30.01.2004 Original published format: US 540587 P | [2006/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005075498 | Date: | 18.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1711512 | Date: | 18.10.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.08.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1711512 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/20 | [2006/42] | CPC: |
C07K1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/42] | Extension states | AL | 25.08.2006 | HR | 25.08.2006 | LT | 25.08.2006 | LV | 25.08.2006 | MK | 25.08.2006 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON PROTEINEN | [2006/42] | English: | PROCESS FOR PURIFYING PROTEINS | [2006/42] | French: | PROCEDE DESTINE A PURIFIER DES PROTEINES | [2006/42] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/42] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Ma, Saufung, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | 02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | 03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Vanhalst, Koen De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | 04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Bublak, Wolfgang, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Ma, Saufung, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Vanhalst, Koen De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Bublak, Wolfgang, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2014/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Ma, Saufung, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Vanhalst, Koen De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Bublak, Wolfgang, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Ma, Saufung, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Vanhalst, Koen De Clercq & Partners cvba E. Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Friede, Thomas, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Ma, Saufung, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Friede, Thomas, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Ma, Saufung, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Campabadal Patents bvba Koningin Astridlaan 33 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Friede, Thomas, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2013/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Campabadal Patents bvba Koningin Astridlaan 33 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
22.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Friede, Thomas, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2012/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
16.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
17.10.2012
ADMISSIBLE Lammert, Reinhild Am Gönnabach 13 07751 Krippendorf Stadt Jena / DE Opponent's representative Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Campabadal Patents bvba Koningin Astridlaan 33 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | |||
04
11.10.2012
BARDEHLE PAGENBERG Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE Opponent's representative Friede, Thomas, et al, et al Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | |||
Former [2012/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
19.09.2012
ADMISSIBLE Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | ||
02
10.10.2012
GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 SE-751 84 Uppsala / SE Opponent's representative Kilander, Ebba Annika, et al, et al GE Healthcare Bio-Sciences AB Patent Department Björkgatan 30 751 84 Uppsala / SE | |||
03
11.10.2012
Amgen, Inc One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks CA 91320 / US Opponent's representative Campabadal i Monfà, Gemma Campabadal Patents bvba Koningin Astridlaan 33 9100 Sint-Niklaas / BE | |||
Former [2012/42] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
11.09.2012
Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB Opponent's representative Sant, David Paul, et al, et al Taylor Wessing LLP 5 New Street Square London EC4A 3TW / GB | 15.11.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.06.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 27.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.02.2014 | 19.02.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2014 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2014/48] | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2004 | AT | 11.01.2012 | BE | 11.01.2012 | CH | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | LI | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | IE | 21.07.2012 | LU | 21.07.2012 | MC | 31.07.2012 | [2015/08] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 21.07.2004 | |
AT | 11.01.2012 | ||
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
LU | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
LU | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
BE | 11.01.2012 | ||
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.07.2012 | ||
MC | 31.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | BE | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5231178 (HOLTZ GREGORY C [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,13,16 * columns 11-13, 26-27, 32 * [Y] 3,8,10-12,15,18,19; | [XY]US5395856 (HAASE FERDINAND C [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,13,14,16,17 * column 10; example 8 *[Y] 3,8,10-12,15,18,19; | [XY]US5928915 (WARNER THOMAS G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7,9,13,14,16,17 * column 23 - column 24; example 1 * [Y] 3,8,10-12,15,18,19 |