EP1664271 - MODULATION OF DIACYLGLYCEROL ACYLTRANSFERASE 2 EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Isis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 2855 Gazelle Court Carlsbad, CA 92010 / US | [2011/39] |
Former [2008/25] | For all designated states ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 2292 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Isis Parmaceuticals, Inc. 2292 Faraday Avenue Carlsbad, CA 92008 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHANOT, Sanjay 7965 Paseo Aliso Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | 02 /
DOBIE, Kenneth, W. 703 Stratford Court, Nr. 4 Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | 03 /
YU, Xing-Xian 12605 El Camino Real San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
BHANOT, Sanjay 7965 Paseo Aliso Carlsbad, CA 92009 / US | ||
02 /
DOBIE, Kenneth, W. 703 Stratford Court, Nr. 4 Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | |||
03 /
YU, Xing-Xian 1260-F El Camino Real San Diego, CA 92130 / US | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2007/40] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Chapman, Paul William, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04779444.1 | 18.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US24384 | Priority number, date | US20030643801 | 18.08.2003 Original published format: US 643801 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005019418 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1664271 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664271 | Date: | 08.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.05.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/11, C07H21/04 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/48 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07H21/02 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/26] | C07H21/04 | ||
Former IPC [2006/23] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | 14.03.2006 | HR | 14.03.2006 | LT | 14.03.2006 | LV | 14.03.2006 | MK | 14.03.2006 | Title | German: | MODULATION DER EXPRESSION VON DIACYLGLYCERIN-ACYLTRANSFERASE 2 | [2006/23] | English: | MODULATION OF DIACYLGLYCEROL ACYLTRANSFERASE 2 EXPRESSION | [2006/23] | French: | MODULATION DE L'EXPRESSION DE LA DIACYLGLYCEROL ACYLTRANSFERASE 2 | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 07.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.07.2010 | 21.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10175722.7 / EP2284267 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.06.2011 | BE | 08.06.2011 | CY | 08.06.2011 | CZ | 08.06.2011 | DK | 08.06.2011 | EE | 08.06.2011 | FI | 08.06.2011 | HU | 08.06.2011 | PL | 08.06.2011 | RO | 08.06.2011 | SE | 08.06.2011 | SI | 08.06.2011 | SK | 08.06.2011 | TR | 08.06.2011 | IE | 18.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | BG | 08.09.2011 | GR | 09.09.2011 | ES | 19.09.2011 | PT | 10.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
TR | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
BG | 08.09.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
IE | 18.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
DK | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
PL | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
RO | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SK | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 08.06.2011 | ||
EE | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
PT | 10.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
BE | 08.06.2011 | ||
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 08.06.2011 | |
CY | 08.06.2011 | ||
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
SI | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 08.06.2011 | |
FI | 08.06.2011 | ||
SE | 08.06.2011 | ||
GR | 09.09.2011 | ||
ES | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO02068595 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1,12-14,20,23 * page 27, paragraph 2 * * page 31, paragraph 2 - page 32, paragraph 3 * * page 35, paragraph 3 * [Y] 21,22; | [XY]WO03053363 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US]) [X] 1,12-14,20,23 * paragraphs [0108] , [0110] * * paragraph [0112] * * paragraphs [0302] - [0306] * * paragraph [0318] * [Y] 21,22; | [DY] - MARTIN P, "38. EIN NEUER ZUGANG ZU 2'-O-ALKYLRIBONUCLEOSIDEN UND EIGENSCHAFTEN DEREN OLIGONUCLEOTIDE", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, VERLAG HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA. BASEL, CH, (19950101), vol. 78, ISSN 0018-019X, pages 486 - 504, XP000857415 [DY] 21,22 * page 493, paragraph 2 - page 497, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19950780219 | International search | [Y]US5998148 (BENNETT C FRANK [US], et al); | [X]US6605451 (MARMARO JEFFERY M [US], et al) | Examination | WO0071164 | WO0175164 | WO0222635 | WO0244321 | WO0250247 | WO03030826 | - CASES S ET AL, "Cloning of DGAT2, a second mammalian diacylglycerol acyltransferase, and related family members", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, INC, US LNKD- DOI:10.1074/JBC.M106219200, (20011019), vol. 276, no. 42, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 38870 - 38876, XP002199715 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M106219200 | - ELBASHIR S M ET AL, "Functional anatomy of siRNAs for mediating efficient RNAi in Drosophila melanogaster embryo lysate", EMBO JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/EMBOJ/20.23.6877, (20011203), vol. 20, no. 23, ISSN 0261-4189, pages 6877 - 6888, XP002225998 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/emboj/20.23.6877 | - ELBASHIR SAYDA M ET AL, "Duplexes of 21-nucleotide RNAs mediate RNA interference in cultured mammalian cells", NATURE, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1038/35078107, (20010524), vol. 411, no. 6836, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 494 - 498, XP002206451 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35078107 | - ELBASHIR SAYDA M ET AL, "RNA interference is mediated by 21- and 22-nucleotide RNAs", GENES AND DEVELOPMENT, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, PLAINVIEW, NY, US LNKD- DOI:10.1101/GAD.862301, (20010115), vol. 15, no. 2, ISSN 0890-9369, pages 188 - 200, XP002204651 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/gad.862301 | - NCBI, (20030406), Database accession no. NM_032564 | by applicant | US3687808 | US4426330 | US4469863 | US4476301 | US4534899 | WO8804924 | US4837028 | US5023243 | US5034506 | US5177196 | US5188897 | US5214134 | US5264423 | WO9324510 | US5276019 | US5278302 | US5286717 | WO9426764 | US5466677 | US5489677 | US5543152 | US5561225 | US5587361 | US5602240 | US5608046 | US5610289 | WO9713499 | US5625050 | US5677439 | US5719262 | US5770713 | WO9839352 | WO9914226 | US6287860 | WO0168848 | WO0208260 | WO0236743 | US6426220 | US2003027780 | EP1308459 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutical Salts", J. OF PHARMA SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - MURANISHI, CRITICAL REVIEWS IN THERAPEUTIC DRUG CARRIER SYSTEMS, (1990), vol. 7, page 1 | - EL-HARIRI ET AL., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1992), vol. 44, page 651 | - PAPAHADJOPOULOS ET AL., ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1987), vol. 507, page 64 | - GABIZON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1988), vol. 85, page 6949 | - SUNAMOTO ET AL., BULL. CHEM. SOC. JPN., (1980), vol. 53, page 2778 | - ILLUM ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1984), vol. 167, page 79 | - KLIBANOV ET AL., FEBS LETT., (1990), vol. 268, page 235 | - CHIANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1991), vol. 266, pages 18162 - 18171 |