EP1653992 - USE OF A VEGF ANTAGONIST IN COMBINATION WITH RADIATION THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Road Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 1020 Walnut Avenue Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19107 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states REGENERON PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. 777 Old Saw Mill River Toad Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | ||
For all designated states THOMAS JEFFERSON UNIVERSITY 1020 Walnut Avenue Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLASH, Jocelyn 321 Channing Way Alameda, CA 94502 / US | 02 /
YANCOPOULOS, George 1519 Baptist Church Road Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 03 /
WACHSBERGER, Phyllis R. Bodine Building, Room G302B, 111 South 11th Street Philadelphia, PA 19107 / US | 04 /
DICKER, Adam, P. 418 Silver Hill Road Cherry Hill, NJ 08002 / US | 05 /
BURD, Randy 219 Sugartown Road Wayne, PA 19087 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Andrew J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Bentham, Andrew J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04779673.5 | 30.07.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US24675 | Priority number, date | US20030492864P | 06.08.2003 Original published format: US 492864 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005016369 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1653992 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/18, A61K45/00, A61P35/00 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61K41/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/179 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/179, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K41/00, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES VEGF-ANTAGONISTEN IN KOMBINATION MIT STRAHLENTHERAPIE | [2006/19] | English: | USE OF A VEGF ANTAGONIST IN COMBINATION WITH RADIATION THERAPY | [2006/19] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN ANTAGONISTE DES VEGF EN COMBINAISON AVEC UNE RADIOTHERAPIE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 06.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 26.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/31] | 12.03.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1179541 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [X] 1,4-11,14-18 * page 17, line 11 - line 23 * * page 74, line 42 - line 46 *; | [XY]WO02060489 (REGENERON PHARMA [US], et al) [X] 18 * sentence 9 - sentence 19; figures 13A,14A * * page 40, lines 21-24; example 30 * [Y] 1-17; | [XY]WO02070008 (IMCLONE SYSTEMS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4-11,14-17 * page 55, paragraphs 251-255 * [Y] 1-17; | [PX]WO03068155 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US], et al) [PX] 1,4-11,14-18 * page 5, line 1 - page 6, line 25 * * page 38, line 18 - page 39, line 33 *; | [XY] - WACHSBERGER PHYLLIS ET AL, "Tumor response to ionizing radiation combined with antiangiogenesis or vascular targeting agents: exploring mechanisms of interaction.", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH : AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH. JUN 2003, (200306), vol. 9, no. 6, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 1957 - 1971, XP002300697 [X] 1,5,6,9,10 * page 1962, column 2 - page 1963, column 1; table 2 * [Y] 1-17 | [Y] - HOLASH JOCELYN ET AL, "VEGF-Trap: A VEGF blocker with potent antitumor effects", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20020820), vol. 99, no. 17, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11393 - 11398, XP002300698 [Y] 1-17 * page 11396, column 1 - page 11397, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.172398299 |