EP1651648 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2012 [2012/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IRM LLC 131 Front Street P.O. Box HM 2899 Hamilton HM LX / BM | [2011/01] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states IRM LLC PO Box HM 2899 Hamilton HM LX / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIM, Taebo 93 Sherman Road, Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | 02 /
LEE, Hyun, Soo 9085 Judicial Drive 2305 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 03 /
REN, Pingda 4148 Twilight Ridge San Diego, California 92130 / US | 04 /
DING, Qiang 11686 Carmel Creek Road 204 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 05 /
WANG, Xia 8219 Bryn Glen Way San Diego, California 92129 / US | 06 /
UNO, Tetsuo 4495 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 07 /
ZHANG, Guobao 12736 Via Nieve San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 08 /
LIU, Yi 4255 Corte de Sausalito San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 09 /
LI, Bing 9675 Genesee Avenue, Apt. I-1 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 10 /
LI, Lintong 5360 Toscana Way, 119 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 11 /
GRAY, Nathaniel 5652 Lamas Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | 12 /
YOU, Shuli 4770 Conrad Avenue, Apt. 234 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | [2007/23] |
Former [2007/22] | 01 /
SIM, Taebo Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | ||
02 /
LEE, Hyun, Soo 9085 Judicial Drive 2305 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
REN, Pingda 4148 Twilight Ridge San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
04 /
DING, Qiang 11686 Carmel Creek Road 204 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
05 /
WANG, Xia 8219 Bryn Glen Way San Diego, California 92129 / US | |||
06 /
UNO, Tetsuo 4495 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Guobao 12736 Via Nieve San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
08 /
LIU, Yi 4255 Corte de Sausalito San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
LI, Bing 9675 Genesee Avenue, Apt. I-1 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
10 /
LI, Lintong 5360 Toscana Way, 119 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
11 /
GRAY, Nathaniel 5652 Lamas Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
12 /
YOU, Shuli 4770 Conrad Avenue, Apt. 234 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | |||
Former [2007/18] | 01 /
SIM, Taebo Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | ||
02 /
LEE, Hyun, Soo 9085 Judicial Drive 2305 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
REN, Pingda 4148 Twilight Ridge San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
04 /
DING, Qiang 8465 Regents Road 264 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
WANG, Xia 8219 Bryn Glen Way San Diego, California 92129 / US | |||
06 /
UNO, Tetsuo 4495 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Guobao 12736 Via Nieve San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
08 /
LIU, Yi 4255 Corte de Sausalito San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
LI, Bing 9675 Genesee Avenue, Apt. I-1 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
10 /
LI, Lintong 5360 Toscana Way, 119 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
11 /
GRAY, Nathaniel 5652 Lamas Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
12 /
YOU, Shuli 4770 Conrad Avenue, Apt. 234 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | |||
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
SIM, Taebo Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02467 / US | ||
02 /
LEE, Hyun, Soo 4089 Nobel Drive 3 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
REN, Pingda 4148 Twilight Ridge San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
04 /
DING, Qiang 8465 Regents Road 264 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
WANG, Xia 8219 Bryn Glen Way San Diego, California 92129 / US | |||
06 /
UNO, Tetsuo 4495 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Guobao 12736 Via Nieve San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
08 /
LIU, Yi 4255 Corte de Sausalito San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
LI, Bing 9675 Genesee Avenue, Apt. I-1 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
10 /
LI, Lintong 5360 Toscana Way, 119 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
11 /
GRAY, Nathaniel 5652 Lamas Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
12 /
YOU, Shuli 4770 Conrad Avenue, Apt. 234 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | |||
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
SIM, Taebo 12644 Torrey Bluff Drive, Apt. 212 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
02 /
LEE, Hyun, Soo 4089 Nobel Drive 3 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
03 /
REN, Pingda 4148 Twilight Ridge San Diego, California 92130 / US | |||
04 /
DING, Qiang 8465 Regents Road 264 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
05 /
WANG, Xia 8219 Bryn Glen Way San Diego, California 92129 / US | |||
06 /
UNO, Tetsuo 4495 Shorepointe Way San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Guobao 7699 Palmilla Drive, 3306 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
08 /
LIU, Yi 4255 Corte de Sausalito San Diego, CA 92130 / US | |||
09 /
LI, Bing 9675 Genesee Avenue, Apt. I-1 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | |||
10 /
LI, Lintong 5360 Toscana Way, 119 San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
11 /
GRAY, Nathaniel 5652 Lamas Street San Diego, CA 92122 / US | |||
12 /
YOU, Shuli 4770 Conrad Avenue, Apt. 234 San Diego, CA 92117 / US | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/34] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/18] | Hillebrand, Dirk Novartis AG, Patent- und Markenabteilung, Lichtstrasse 35 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 04779732.9 | 29.07.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004US24764 | Priority number, date | US20030491133P | 29.07.2003 Original published format: US 491133 P | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005011597 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1651648 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, C07D487/04, A61K31/5025 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ALS PROTEINKINASEINHIBITOREN | [2006/18] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS AS PROTEIN KINASE INHIBITORS | [2006/18] | French: | COMPOSES ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DES PROTEINES KINASES | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/13] | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9961444 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,2,7,20,23,25,30-35 *; | [X]WO0024744 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * page 101; claim 1 * * page 2, line 18 - line 25 * * page 1, paragraph L *; | [PX]WO2004041821 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [PX] 1-10 * page 47 - page 52; claim 1 * * page 19, line 3 - line 7 *; | [PX]WO2004041822 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [PX] 1-5,7-10 * page 72 - page 77; claim 1 * * page 19, line 11 - line 15 *; | [PX]WO2004041823 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [PX] 1,2,7-10 * page 55 - page 56; claim 1 ** page 3, line 3 - line 10 * | International search | [A] - KINDLER T. ET AL., "BCR-ABL as a target for novel therapeutic interventions", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC TARGETS, (2002), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 85 - 101, XP008067227 |