EP1654770 - METHOD OF MAKING STRAINED SEMICONDUCTOR CMOS TRANSISTORS HAVING LATTICE-MISMATCHED REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/19] | STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MAKING STRAINED SEMICONDUCTOR CMOS TRANSISTORS HAVING LATTICE-MISMATCHED SOURCE AND DRAIN REGIONS | ||
[2010/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [2011/13] |
Former [2006/19] | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Huajie, c/o IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 02 /
CHIDAMBARRAO, Dureseti 29 Old Mill Road Weston, CT 06883 / US | 03 /
GLUSCHENKOV, Oleg G. 160 Academy Street, Apt. 9H Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 / US | 04 /
STEEGEN, An, L., c/o IBM United Kingdom Ltd. Intellectual Property Law, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | 05 /
YANG, Haining, S. 36 Robinson Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | [2007/21] |
Former [2006/19] | 01 /
CHEN, Huajie 622 Avalon Lake Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | ||
02 /
CHIDAMBARRAO, Dureseti 29 Old Mill Road Weston, CT 06883 / US | |||
03 /
GLUSCHENKOV, Oleg G. 160 Academy Street, Apt. 9H Poughkeepsie, NY 12601 / US | |||
04 /
STEEGEN, An, L. 150 Southfield Avenue, Apt. 2483 Stamford, CT 06902 / US | |||
05 /
YANG, Haining, S. 36 Robinson Lane Wappingers Falls, NY 12590 / US | Representative(s) | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Litherland, David Peter IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 04780054.5 | 04.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US25152 | Priority number, date | US20030604607 | 04.08.2003 Original published format: US 604607 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005017964 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1654770 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1654770 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/336, H01L21/8238, H01L21/20 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
H01L21/8238 (KR);
H01L21/823807 (EP,US);
H01L21/823814 (EP,US);
H01L27/0922 (EP,US);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L29/66628 (EP,US);
H01L29/66636 (EP,US);
H01L29/7848 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02636 (EP,US);
H01L29/165 (EP,US);
H01L29/6656 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/19] | H01L31/0328, H01L31/0336, H01L21/336, H01L21/8238 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CMOS-TRANSISTOREN MIT VERSPANNTEM HALBLEITER MIT GITTERFEHLANGEPASSTEN REGIONEN | [2010/40] | English: | METHOD OF MAKING STRAINED SEMICONDUCTOR CMOS TRANSISTORS HAVING LATTICE-MISMATCHED REGIONS | [2010/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS CMOS A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS CONTRAINTS COMPRENANT DES REGIONS A DESACCORD DE RESEAU | [2010/40] |
Former [2006/19] | STRUKTUR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CMOS-TRANSISTOREN MIT VERSPANNTEM HALBLEITER MIT GITTERFEHLANGEPASSTER SOURCE- UND DRAIN-REGION | ||
Former [2006/19] | STRUCTURE AND METHOD OF MAKING STRAINED SEMICONDUCTOR CMOS TRANSISTORS HAVING LATTICE-MISMATCHED SOURCE AND DRAIN REGIONS | ||
Former [2006/19] | STRUCTURE ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE TRANSISTORS CMOS CONTRAINTS A SEMI-CONDUCTEURS COMPRENANT DES REGIONS SOURCE ET DRAIN A DEFAUT D'APPARIEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 21.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | FI | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | IT | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | ES | 11.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | LU | 04.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 04.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 04.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
LU | 04.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
IT | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
ES | 11.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
FI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6165826 (CHAU ROBERT S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,8-13 * column 6, line 1 - line 4; figure 3 * * column 8, line 31 - line 64 * * column 12, line 16 - line 20 *; | [A]US2002063292 (ARMSTRONG MARK [US], et al) [A] 1,12,13* paragraphs [0005] - [0007]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6495402 (YU BIN [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,14-20 * column 3, line 14 - line 16; figure 3 * * column 4, lines 24-37 *; | [Y]US2003027414 (KO YOUNG-GUN [KR]) [Y] 21-25 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012]; figures 6-15 *; | [XY]US2003080361 (MURTHY ANAND [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-13 * paragraphs [0015] , [0029]; figures 1-6 * [Y] 1-12,21-25; | [Y]US2003111699 (WASSHUBER CHRISTOPH [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0004] , [0030] , [0031]; figures 3-6 *; | [E]US2004173815 (YEO YEE-CHIA [SG], et al) [E] 1-6,8-12 * paragraphs [0030] - [0034]; figures 3A,3B *; | [E]WO2005010982 (INTEL CORP [US]) [E] 1,2,5,6,8-12 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0028] , [0036] , [0037]; figures 1-8 *; | [XY] - GANNAVARAM S ET AL, "LOW TEMPERATURE ( 800öC) RECESSED JUNCTION SELECTIVE SILICON-GERMANIUM SOURCE/DRAIN TECHNOLOGY FOR SUB-70 NM CMOS", INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING 2000. IEDM. TECHNICAL DIGEST. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, DEC. 10 - 13, 2000; [INTERNATIONAL ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20001210), ISBN 978-0-7803-6439-4, pages 437 - 440, XP000988876 [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,13 * page 437; figures 1,3,18,19 * * page 438, column R, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3,4,14-20 | International search | [A]US5155571 (WANG KANG L [US], et al); | [A]US2001003364 (SUGAWARA MINORU [JP], et al) |