EP1649528 - FUEL CARTRIDGE WITH FLEXIBLE LINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2015/26] | For all designated states Intelligent Energy Limited Charnwood Building Holywell Park Ashby Road Loughborough Leicestershire LE11 3GB / GB | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Société BIC 14, rue Jeanne d'Asnières 92611 Clichy Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADAMS, Paul 21 Perry Drive Monroe, CT 06468 / US | 02 /
CURELLO, Andrew, J. 15 Eramo Terrace Hamden, CT 06518 / US | 03 /
FAIRBANKS, Floyd 103 Birch Lane Naugatuck, CT 06770 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Ahmad, Sheikh Shakeel, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2017/36] |
Former [2006/17] | Rupp, Christian, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780285.5 | 26.07.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US25424 | Priority number, date | US20030629004 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: US 629004 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005013406 | Date: | 10.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649528 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649528 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.02.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04, H01M8/04082, F16K24/04, F16K24/06, // F17C11/00 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
F16K24/00 (KR);
F16K24/04 (EP,US);
F16K24/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/04 (EP,KR,US);
F17C11/005 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y10T137/3084 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3087 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86324 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/17] | H01M2/00, H01M8/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFKASSETTE MIT FLEXIBLER AUSKLEIDUNG | [2006/17] | English: | FUEL CARTRIDGE WITH FLEXIBLE LINER | [2006/17] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE COMBUSTIBLE A CONTENANT FLEXIBLE | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.07.2004 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 26.07.2004 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PT | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1087455 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * figures 6,7 *; | [A]WO02099916 (POLYFUEL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0095] ** figures 7,10 *; | [X]EP1280219 (FOAMEX LP [US]) [X] 1-30 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0029] * * figures 13-19 *; | [A]US2003129464 (BECERRA JUAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0059] * * figures 2,3,11,12 * | International search | [Y]US6460733 (ACKER WILLIAM P [US], et al); | [Y]US2002197522 (LAWRENCE CRAIG [US], et al); | [Y]US2003008193 (KINKELAAR MARK R [US], et al); | [Y]US6506513 (YONETSU MAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]US2003082427 (PRASAD RAVI [US], et al); | [Y]US2002127451 (CAO YIDING [US], et al); | [Y]US3507708 (VIGNAUD RENE); | [Y]US4562123 (SHIMIZU TOSHIO [JP], et al) | Examination | WO03004145 | EP1313160 | US2003136453 | by applicant | US5992008 | US5945231 | US2003082427 | EP1280219 | US2003129464 | EP1087455 | WO02099916 | EP1313160 | US2003077493 | US2003096150 | US3508708 | US4562123 | US3404061 | US20030356793 |