EP1654700 - LOCKING BOLT WORK APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIEBOLD, INCORPORATED 5995 Mayfair Road North Canton, OH 44720 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCER, Scott A. 10103 LINDESMITH ROAD HANOVERTON, Ohio 44423 / US | 02 /
MCCRACKEN, Richard W. 162 N. BEVERLY AVENUE YOUNGSTOWN, Ohio 44515 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/19] | Meldrum, David James, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04780346.5 | 05.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US25494 | Priority number, date | US20030494614P | 11.08.2003 Original published format: US 494614 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005019580 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1654700 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1654700 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E05C19/00, E05B65/00, G07F19/00 | [2015/16] | CPC: |
G07F19/20 (EP,US);
E05B65/0075 (EP,US);
E05C19/001 (EP,US);
G07F19/205 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | G07F19/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/19] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PL [2015/40] |
Former [2006/46] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, PL | ||
Former [2006/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERRIEGELUNGSBOLZEN-ARBEITSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN GELDAUTOMATEN | [2006/19] | English: | LOCKING BOLT WORK APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATED BANKING MACHINE | [2006/19] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE POUR DISTRIBUTEUR BANCAIRE | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 08.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.04.2015 | 09.04.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 24.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | [2016/24] |
Former [2016/21] | IT | 30.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4706577 (JONES PAMELA K [GB]); | [A]US5231935 (ODER CHARLES D [US], et al); | [X]US6394007 (LEWIS KIM R [US], et al); | [YP]US6663001 (SUTTIE ROBERT J [GB], et al) | Examination | US2004079683 | WO2004036386 | by applicant | US6394007 |