EP1664164 - OXYGEN SCAVENGER BLOCK COPOLYMERS AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cryovac, Inc. P.O. Box 464, 100 Rogers Bridge Road Duncan, SC 29334 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EBNER, Cynthia, L. 102 N. Staghorn Lane Greer, SC 29650 / US | 02 /
BERRIER, Authur, L. 201 Huddersfield Drive Simpsonville, SC 29681 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780434.9 | 26.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US25596 | Priority number, date | US20030649747 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: US 649747 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023911 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1664164 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664164 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B01J20/26 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
B01J20/26 (EP,US);
B01J20/262 (EP,US);
B01J20/264 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
C08J5/18 (EP,US);
B32B2307/74 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
C08J2387/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLOCKCOPOLYMERE ALS SAUERSTOFF-FÄNGER UND DIESE ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2006/44] | English: | OXYGEN SCAVENGER BLOCK COPOLYMERS AND COMPOSITIONS | [2006/23] | French: | COPOLYMERES SEQUENCES ET COMPOSITIONS DE DESOXYGENATION | [2006/23] |
Former [2006/23] | SAUERSTOFFFÄNGER-BLOCKCOPOLYMERE UND -ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 26.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | BE | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | PL | 04.04.2007 | RO | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | LU | 26.08.2007 | IE | 27.08.2007 | MC | 31.08.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | HU | 05.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
LU | 26.08.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
HU | 05.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
IE | 27.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.08.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
BE | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | |
ES | 15.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5981676 (GAUTHIER WILLIAM JOHN [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [AD]US6254803 (MATTHEWS ANDREW E [US], et al) [AD] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1213326 (TOYO SEIKAN KAISHA LTD [JP]) [A] 1-28* the whole document *; | [A]US6572783 (CAI GANGFENG [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * the whole document * |