EP1661211 - TRIAXIAL BULKHEAD CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADC Telecommunications, Inc. 13625 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344-2252 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KHEMAKHEM, M'hamed, Anis 5970 Chasewood Parkway 202 Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780590.8 | 10.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US25782 | Priority number, date | US20030640472 | 12.08.2003 Original published format: US 640472 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005020382 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661211 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661211 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/646 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H01R24/542 (EP,US);
H01R13/00 (KR);
H01R13/646 (KR);
H01R24/52 (EP,US);
H01R9/05 (KR);
H01R2103/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/22] | H01R12/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | TRIAXIALER BULKHEAD-VERBINDER | [2006/22] | English: | TRIAXIAL BULKHEAD CONNECTOR | [2006/22] | French: | CONNECTEUR DE CLOISON TRIAXIAL | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 11.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.08.2004 | AT | 02.11.2011 | BE | 02.11.2011 | CY | 02.11.2011 | CZ | 02.11.2011 | DK | 02.11.2011 | EE | 02.11.2011 | FI | 02.11.2011 | IT | 02.11.2011 | NL | 02.11.2011 | PL | 02.11.2011 | RO | 02.11.2011 | SE | 02.11.2011 | SI | 02.11.2011 | SK | 02.11.2011 | TR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 02.02.2012 | GR | 03.02.2012 | ES | 13.02.2012 | PT | 02.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
TR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
FI | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
ES | 13.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 02.11.2011 | |
BE | 02.11.2011 | ||
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
IT | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
RO | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
SK | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
DK | 02.11.2011 | ||
EE | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 02.02.2012 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
CZ | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
CY | 02.11.2011 | ||
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
PL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | BE | 02.11.2011 | |
NL | 02.11.2011 | ||
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
SE | 02.11.2011 | ||
SI | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | NL | 02.11.2011 | |
GR | 03.02.2012 | ||
PT | 02.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4674809 (HOLLYDAY ROBERT D [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11* abstract *; | [A]US5062808 (HOSLER SR ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5413502 (WANG TSAN-CHI [TW]) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract *; | [A]US5417588 (OLSON CYNTHIA G [US], et al) [A] 1,8,11 * abstract * |