EP1658736 - A COMMUNICATION CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR MANAGING THE TRAFFIC FLOW OF A COMMUNICATION CONNECTION DURING A CELL RESELECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048-5343 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2012/34] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility LLC 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states Motorola Mobility, Inc. 600 North US Highway 45 Libertyville, IL 60048 / US | ||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTZIN, Michael D. 2075 Jordan Terrace Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | 02 /
BINZEL, Charles P. 17001 60th Street Bristol, WI 53104 / US | 03 /
PECEN, Mark E. 333 Old Post Road Waterloo, Ontario, N2L 5P3 / CA | 04 /
SPEAR, Stephen L. 25 Williamsburg Skokie, IL 60203 / US | [2007/25] |
Former [2006/21] | 01 /
KOTZIN, Michael D. 2075 Jordan Terrace Buffalo Grove, IL 60089 / US | ||
02 /
BINZEL, Charles P. 17001 60th Street Bristol, WI 53104 / US | |||
03 /
PECEN, Mark E. 681 S. Oak Street Palatine, IL 60067 / US | |||
04 /
SPEAR, Stephen L. 25 Williamsburg Skokie, IL 60203 / US | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Kuhnen & Wacker Intellectual Property Law Firm Prinz-Ludwig-Strasse 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780817.5 | 11.08.2004 | [2006/21] | WO2004US26041 | Priority number, date | US20030647776 | 25.08.2003 Original published format: US 647776 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005022304 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658736 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658736 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/18 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
H04W36/18 (EP,US);
H04W36/02 (EP,US);
H04W36/362 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/26] | H04Q7/38 | ||
Former IPC [2006/21] | H04Q7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/48] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSTEUERUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG DES VERKEHRSFLUSSES EINER KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG WÄHREND EINER ZELLENNEUAUSWAHL | [2006/21] | English: | A COMMUNICATION CONTROLLER AND METHOD FOR MANAGING THE TRAFFIC FLOW OF A COMMUNICATION CONNECTION DURING A CELL RESELECTION | [2006/21] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE DE COMMUNICATION ET PROCEDE DE GESTION DE L'ECOULEMENT DU TRAFIC D'UNE CONNEXION DE COMMUNICATION LORS D'UNE RESELECTION DE CELLULES | [2006/21] | Entry into regional phase | 09.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.10.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.09.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9740593 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [X]EP0952749 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XY]EP1079653 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]); | [Y]US2002168980 (GWON YOUNGJUNE L [US], et al) | International search | [A]US6141553 (FERNANDEZ CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al); | [A]US6374112 (WIDEGREN INA [SE], et al); | [A]US6594238 (WALLENTIN BO S P [SE], et al) | Examination | EP0577322 | US5828659 | US6052598 | WO0126410 |