EP1654488 - FITTING WITH SEPARABLE GRIPPING DEVICE FOR PIPE AND TUBE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Swagelok Company 29500 Solon Road Solon OH 44139 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Peter 3495 Edison Road Cleveland Heights, Ohio 44121 / US | 02 /
BENNETT, Mark, A. 18436 Snyder Road Bainbridge Twp., Ohio 44139 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Neill, Alastair William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Neill, Alastair William, et al Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 04780867.0 | 12.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US26096 | Priority number, date | US20030642094 | 15.08.2003 Original published format: US 642094 | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005019717 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1654488 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F16L19/065 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
F16L19/14 (EP,US);
F16L19/00 (KR);
F16L19/065 (KR);
F16L19/08 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSSTÜCK MIT TRENNBARER GREIFVORRICHTUNG FÜR ROHRE UND SCHLÄUCHE | [2006/19] | English: | FITTING WITH SEPARABLE GRIPPING DEVICE FOR PIPE AND TUBE | [2006/19] | French: | RACCORD AVEC DISPOSITIF DE PREHENSION AMOVIBLE POUR CONDUITES ET TUYAUX | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 25.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/07] | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/07] | Request for further processing for: | 12.02.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 12.02.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.02.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2008 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US6131963 (WILLIAMS PETER C [US], et al) [Y] 23,27-29* column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 56; figures 16-21 *; | [XY]WO02063195 (SWAGELOK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-22,24-26,30 * the whole document * [Y] 23,27-29 |