EP1660175 - MODULAR PATIENT SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LOMA LINDA UNIVERSITY MEDICAL CENTER 24888 Prospect Street Loma Linda, CA 92350 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIGNEY, Nick 1381 Milburn Avenue Redlands, CA 92373 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Dan 11194 San Lucas Loma Linda, CA 92354 / US | 03 /
LESYNA, David 1310 Mills Avenue Redlands, CA 92373 / US | 04 /
MILLER, Dan 12435 14th Street Yucaipa, CA 92399 / US | 05 /
MOYERS, Michael 3017 Shadid Drive Colton, CA 92324 / US | 06 /
CHENG, Chieh 25965 Redlands Boulevard Apt. A Redlands, CA 92373 / US | 07 /
BAUMANN, Mike 20842 Oakdale Lane Riverside, CA 92508 / US | 08 /
MCALLASTER, Steven 10730 Church Street Apt. 256 Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730 / US | 09 /
SLATER, Jerry 1210 Highland Avenue Redlands, CA 92373 / US | [2012/09] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
RIGNEY, Nick 1381 Milburn Avenue Redlands, CA 92373 / US | ||
02 /
ANDERSON, Dan 11194 San Lucas Loma Linda, CA 92354 / US | |||
03 /
LESYNA, David 1310 Mills Avenue Redlands, CA 92373 / US | |||
04 /
MILLER, Dan 12435 14th Street Yucaipa, CA 92399 / US | |||
05 /
MOYERS, Michael 3017 Shadid Drive Colton, CA 92324 / US | |||
06 /
CHENG, Chieh 25965 Redlands Boulevard Apt. A Redlands, CA 92373 / US | |||
07 /
BAUMANN, Mike 20842 Oakdale Lane Riverside, CA 92508 / US | |||
08 /
MCALLASTER, Steven 10730 Church Street Apt. 256 Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730 / US | |||
09 /
SLATER, Jerry 1210 Highland Avenue Redlands, CA 92373 / US | Representative(s) | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Findeisen, Marco, et al Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780883.7 | 12.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US26113 | Priority number, date | US20030494699P | 12.08.2003 Original published format: US 494699 P | US20040579095P | 10.06.2004 Original published format: US 579095 P | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005018735 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1660175 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1660175 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/04, A61N5/10 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
A61N5/10 (KR);
A61N5/107 (US);
A61N5/1037 (US);
A61N5/1067 (US);
A61N5/1069 (EP,US);
A61N5/1078 (EP,US);
B25J9/1666 (EP,US);
G01N23/223 (KR);
G05B15/02 (US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP,US);
A61B6/0442 (EP,US);
A61B6/4092 (EP,US);
A61B6/547 (US);
A61N2005/105 (US);
A61N2005/1059 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1061 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1062 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/14] | A61N5/10, G21F5/02 | ||
Former IPC [2006/22] | A61N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/22] | Title | German: | MODULARES PATIENTENUNTERSTÜTZUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/22] | English: | MODULAR PATIENT SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2006/22] | French: | SYSTEME MODULAIRE DE SUPPORT DE PATIENT | [2006/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11004652.1 / EP2368600 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 30.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.08.2004 | AT | 29.02.2012 | CY | 29.02.2012 | CZ | 29.02.2012 | DK | 29.02.2012 | EE | 29.02.2012 | FI | 29.02.2012 | IT | 29.02.2012 | NL | 29.02.2012 | PL | 29.02.2012 | RO | 29.02.2012 | SE | 29.02.2012 | SI | 29.02.2012 | SK | 29.02.2012 | TR | 29.02.2012 | BG | 29.05.2012 | GR | 30.05.2012 | ES | 09.06.2012 | PT | 29.06.2012 | IE | 12.08.2012 | LU | 12.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
LU | 12.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
TR | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 29.05.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
IE | 12.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
ES | 09.06.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 29.02.2012 | |
CY | 29.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
IT | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
SK | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
CZ | 29.02.2012 | ||
DK | 29.02.2012 | ||
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
PL | 29.02.2012 | ||
RO | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
SI | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
EE | 29.02.2012 | ||
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
SE | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 29.02.2012 | |
FI | 29.02.2012 | ||
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 29.02.2012 | |
NL | 29.02.2012 | ||
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
PT | 29.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 29.02.2012 | |
GR | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 29.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4146793 (BERGSTROM LENNART, et al) [A] 1,18,31,44 * column 4, line 20 - line 27; figure 2 *; | [A]US4688780 (HANZ GEORGE [US]) [A] 1,18,31,44 * figure 6 *; | [Y]US4905267 (MILLER DANIEL W [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * figure 2 *; | [A]US5281232 (HAMILTON ALLAN J [US], et al) [A] 1,18,31,44 * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2701391 (ADES ALAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1,18,31,44 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5566681 (MANWARING KIM H [US], et al) [A] 1,18,31,44 * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6003174 (KANTROWITZ ALLEN [US], et al) [A] 1,18,31,44 * column 4, line 18 - line 23; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6598275 (KOLODY TIMOTHY [US], et al) [Y] 44* column 4, line 33 - line 51 *; | [PY]US2004034932 (ZACHAROPOULOS NICK [US], et al) [PY] 1-30,44 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0042] , [0044] * | International search | [A]US5446548 (GERIG LEE H [CA], et al); | [A]US6405072 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) |