EP1754239 - UNIFIED MAGNETIC SHIELDING OF TENSIONED MASK/FRAME ASSEMBLY AND INTERNAL MAGNETIC SHIELD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINKEL, Peter 1022 Chiswell Drive Downingtown, Pennsylvania 19335 / US | 02 /
MUTSO, Rein, Roman 935 West Walnut Street Lancaster, Pennsylvania 17603 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Technicolor European Patent Operations 1-5 Rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson multimedia Patent Department 46 Quai A. Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/08] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte Thomson, European Patent Operations, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04780924.9 | 12.08.2004 | [2007/08] | WO2004US26160 | Priority number, date | US20040574887P | 27.05.2004 Original published format: US 574887 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005119726 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754239 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01J29/02, H01J29/07, H01J31/20 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H01J29/06 (EP);
H01J29/07 (EP);
H01J2229/003 (EP);
H01J2229/0766 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/36] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VEREINIGTE MAGNETISCHE ABSCHIRMUNG EINER GESPANNTEN MASKEN-/RAHMENBAUGRUPPE UND INTERNE MAGNETISCHE ABSCHIRMUNG | [2007/08] | English: | UNIFIED MAGNETIC SHIELDING OF TENSIONED MASK/FRAME ASSEMBLY AND INTERNAL MAGNETIC SHIELD | [2007/08] | French: | ECRAN MAGNETIQUE UNIFIE D'UN ENSEMBLE CADRE DE MASQUE TENDU ET ECRAN MAGNETIQUE INTERNE | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 01.03.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 12.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.03.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 27.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.02.2007 | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0244039 (PHILIPS ELECTRONIC ASSOCIATED [GB], et al) [Y] 5,6 * figure 2 * * column 2, line 30 - line 33 * * column 3, line 16 - line 26 * * column 3, line 51 - line 54 * * column 5, line 46 - line 58 *; | [Y]US5327043 (LAMBERT DENNIS C [US]) [Y] 9* column 1, line 61 - line 68; figure 2 *; | [XY]JP2001229842 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,8,10 * paragraph [0020]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 5,6,9 | International search | [X]JP2001229842 ; | [Y]US5327043 ; | [X]US6459194 ; | [Y]US4845402 ; | [X]US6448702 |