EP1654365 - VIGILANT CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH FLORIDA FAO 126, 4202 East Fowler Avenue Tampa, FL 33620-7900 / US | [2006/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PHILLIPS, Ian, M. 5150 Royal Cypress Circle Tampa, FL 33647 / US | 02 /
TANG, Yao Liang 4892 Beach Dr. SE, Apt.C St. Petersburg, FL 33705 / US | [2006/19] | Representative(s) | Krauss, Jan Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/19] | Krauss, Jan Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04780953.8 | 11.08.2004 | [2006/19] | WO2004US26195 | Priority number, date | US20030494184P | 11.08.2003 Original published format: US 494184 P | US20030494185P | 11.08.2003 Original published format: US 494185 P | US20030513067P | 21.10.2003 Original published format: US 513067 P | US20030513657P | 23.10.2003 Original published format: US 513657 P | [2006/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005017164 | Date: | 24.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1654365 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.02.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/63, C12N15/67, C12N15/864 | [2006/19] | CPC: |
A61K48/0058 (EP,US);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N5/0663 (EP,US);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US);
C12N2510/02 (EP,US);
C12N2750/14143 (EP,US);
C12N2800/00 (EP,US);
C12N2830/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄCHTERZELLEN | [2006/19] | English: | VIGILANT CELLS | [2006/19] | French: | CELLULES VIGILANTES | [2006/19] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/19] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 11.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   06.11.2009 | 31.08.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   21.02.2011 | 31.08.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO2004024867 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [PX] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - TANG YI ET AL, "Hypoxia inducible double plasmid system for myocardial ischemia gene therapy", HYPERTENSION (BALTIMORE), (200202), vol. 39, no. 2 Part 2, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 695 - 698, XP002304487 [X] 1-7,11,14-18,21-24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hy0202.103784 | [X] - PHILLIPS M IAN ET AL, "Vigilant vector: Heart-specific promoter in an adeno-associated virus vector for cardioprotection", HYPERTENSION (BALTIMORE), (200202), vol. 39, no. 2 Part 2, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 651 - 655, XP002304486 [X] 1-11,14-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hy0202.103472 | [XY] - TANG YI ET AL, "Vigilant vectors: Adeno-associated virus with a biosensor to switch on amplified therapeutic genes in specific tissues in life-threatening diseases.", METHODS (ORLANDO), (200210), vol. 28, no. 2, ISSN 1046-2023, pages 259 - 266, XP002304488 [X] 1-11,14-18,20-25 * the whole document * [Y] 12,13,26,27 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1046-2023(02)00231-1 | [Y] - PONNAZHAGAN SELVARANGAN ET AL, "Adeno-associated virus type 2-mediated transduction of murine hematopoietic cells with long-term repopulating ability and sustained expression of a human globin gene in vivo", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (1997), vol. 71, no. 4, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 3098 - 3104, XP002304571 [Y] 12,13,26,27 * abstract * | [A] - HABERMAN R P ET AL, "INDUCIBLE LONG-TERM GENE EXPRESSION IN BRAIN WITH ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS GENE TRANSISTOR", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (1998), vol. 5, no. 12, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 1604 - 1611, XP000907528 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300782 | [A] - RUAN H ET AL, "A HYPOXIA-REGULATED ADENO-ASSOCIATED VIRUS VECTOR FOR CANCER-SPECIFIC GENE THERAPY", NEOPLASIA, DOYMA, BARCELONA,, ES, (2001), vol. 3, no. 3, ISSN 0212-9787, pages 255 - 263, XP002909242 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.neo.7900157 | [A] - SMITH-ARICA JOSEPH R ET AL, "Switching on and off transgene expression within lactotrophic cells in the anterior pituitary gland in vivo", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (200106), vol. 142, no. 6, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 2521 - 2532, XP002304572 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.142.6.2521 | [A] - MELO LUIS G ET AL, "Gene therapy strategy for long-term myocardial protection using adeno-associated virus-mediated delivery of heme oxygenase gene", CIRCULATION, (20020205), vol. 105, no. 5, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 602 - 607, XP002304573 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/hc0502.103363 |